|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1938 | 11/01/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1938 | 14/05/1938 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1939 | 24/06/1939 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1939 | 11/07/1939 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1940 | 20/09/1940 | 52 days | Heavy | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1941 | 01/11/1941 | 44 days | Heavy | Side skirting removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1942 | 12/04/1942 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1942 | 22/10/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1944 | 28/04/1944 | 47 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 30/11/1946 | 36 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 11 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1946 | 17/12/1946 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1947 | 29/10/1947 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 8905 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1949 | 17/03/1949 | 40 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60011 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1950 | 08/06/1950 | 44 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1952 | 10/04/1952 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1953 | Heavy Intermediate | |||||
R & W Hawthorn | 11/12/1953 | 05/01/1954 | 26 days | L/C | |||
R & W Hawthorn | 22/08/1954 | 09/09/1954 | 19 days | L/C | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1954 | 14/01/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1956 | 03/05/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1958 | 22/10/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1959 | 27/05/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1960 | 28/10/1960 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29331 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached. Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1962 | 30/05/1962 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) |
||
Inverurie Works | 29/10/1962 | 31/10/1962 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 17/04/1963 | 19/04/1963 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 31/01/1964 | 31/01/1964 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1964 | 22/04/1964 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
25/04/1964 | Darlington Works (Stripping Shop Outside) | Erecting Shop: D12, D25, D28, D181, D186, Dep. 84, D2078, D2605, D3140, D3455, D3656, D5106, D5155, D7591 painted, D7593 motors mounted, D7594, D7595 equipment fitted, D7596 body, 60124, 60133, 61016, 61256, 61289, 61388, 62065, 62067, 65882, 73004, 73071, 75056, 90047. Stripping Shop (Inside): 61306, 43033; Stripping Shop (Outside): 60011, 60864. Paint Shop (Inside): D182; Paint Shop (Outside): 75006 painted green. Level Crossing: D30, D3378 ex works, D3675, D7592 painted. Works Yard: D2700, D5166, D7597 body, 60973, 63399, 62057 frame, 65033, 65099, 73142 ex works, 90370 ex works. Works Shunter: 68037. Test House: Empty. North Road Scrap Yard: 63388, 65876. Shed (Waiting Works): 60020, 65880, 69020 Stored, 61304, 61321, 68046, 68051, 68054. | SLS/196406 |
04/07/1964 | Darlington Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: D32, D171/6/7/74/8, D5096, D5112/67, D7596/7, DEPT84, D2242/64, D2605, D3151, 60024, 61386, 62062, 65880, 73026/35, 75059/62, 90056/230/43/429/704, 90061. Stripping Shop: 43005, 60836/55, 61030, 63345/70, 90011. Paint Shop: D3675, 75017. Level Crossing: D25, D27, D169, D187. Works Yard: D170/80/9/91, D2163, D2700, 60011/20/527/844/910, 61038, 62002/41, 63460, 65053/99, 73133/55, 90233. Waiting Works: D2586, 60916, 61037, 63383, 63415/22/39, 69003/11/9/20, 90511. Ex Works. 43010/33. Stored: 68016/46/51/4. | SLS/196408 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington Works (Yard) | New Engine Shop: D3940, 12116, tender of 60530. Main Erecting shop: 60530 Sayajirao, 60844, 61214, 61330, 62059, 73095, 73132, 76095/9, 93368/610, D2246/72, D3657. Yard Paint shop: 60118 Archibald Sturrock. Yard: 43008 an 62041 being painted, 60522 Straight Deal, 60145 Saint Mungo, 60011 frames only, 61038 without nameplates, 61084, 63393, 65033/99, 43123, 44734, 68062, D2700, 90407; North Rd. scrap yard: 61229, 61321 and tender of 60020. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
0000 | Modification | Modification: Long guard irons removed | ||
25/06/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4490, name: EMPIRE OF INDIA Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1855 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
06/12/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5326 | ||
10/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1938. Dep: 11/01/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
19/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
29/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1938. Dep: 14/05/1938. | ||
10/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1939. Dep: 24/06/1939. | ||
07/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1939. Dep: 11/07/1939. | ||
31/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/07/1940. Dep: 20/09/1940. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
19/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/09/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed |
||
03/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1942. Dep: 12/04/1942. | ||
10/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1942. Dep: 22/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107) Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
22/10/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
13/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1944. Dep: 28/04/1944. | ||
30/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
28/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 592 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 30/11/1946. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 11 |
||
13/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1946. Dep: 17/12/1946. | ||
25/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1947. Dep: 29/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8905 (Diagram 107) |
||
06/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1949. Dep: 17/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60011 |
||
26/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1950. Dep: 08/06/1950. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
08/06/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
11/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 10/04/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
10/04/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
29/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/06/1953. | ||
11/12/1953 | Works Visit | |||
22/08/1954 | Works Visit | |||
06/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 14/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) |
||
21/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1956. Dep: 03/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) |
||
02/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
13/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
20/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107) |
||
13/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1960. Dep: 28/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29331 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5328 (LNER Corridor) attached. Speedometer fitted |
||
29/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1962. Dep: 30/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29326 (Diagram 107) |
||
11/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow) | ||
29/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1962. Dep: 31/10/1962. | ||
17/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1963. Dep: 19/04/1963. | ||
31/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1964. Dep: 31/01/1964. | ||
22/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/04/1964. Dep: 22/04/1964. | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
11/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60011 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |