|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1938 | 21/01/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1938 | 25/07/1938 | 46 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1939 | 25/09/1939 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1942 | 11/09/1942 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29280 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1943 | 13/12/1943 | 28 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1944 | 23/11/1944 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 67 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1947 | 04/06/1947 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 8946 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1947 | 19/12/1947 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1948 | 19/01/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1948 | 04/03/1948 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1948 | 16/07/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8961 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60029 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1949 | 13/01/1950 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 8947 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1950 | 17/10/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1951 | 05/06/1951 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1952 | 30/10/1952 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1953 | 09/01/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1954 | 22/04/1954 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1955 | 11/02/1955 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1955 | 11/03/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1955 | 19/08/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29292 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1957 | 21/02/1957 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29313 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1957 | 27/02/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1960 | 08/04/1960 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29336 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1960 | 18/11/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1961 | 15/07/1961 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1961 | 13/12/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1962 | 06/06/1962 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1963 | 02/08/1963 | 31 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
09/06/1951 | \"A4\" activity | A4 No. 60029 Woodcock, off works W/E, 9th June, will probably be nursed so as to be fit for the first non-stop 'Capitals Limited' when it eventually starts : Nos. 60017 an 60022 are possible spares, and there is also talk of giving No. 60030 a corridor tender for the same purpose. A4's continue to hold their own on the top main-line jobs; the two Pullmans (the Yorkshire and the Tees-Tyne) are more often than not hauled by them. | SLS/195107 |
11/07/1953 | A4 steaming problems rectified | After some long time, and many complaints, bad steaming by several London A4's has at last been cured. The trouble came to a head as a result of No. 60030, with a spare driver, sitting down on the main line just north of Barnet for a 'blow up.' The two regular drivers of this' loco. had long known how bad she was, but had learned to cope. However, extensive tests were carried out with No. 60033 and as a result, certain alterations were made to the blast pipes on the worst culprits, 60010/29/30 being three of those done. The effect on 60030 has been reported as phenomenal by one fireman, who claimed that with practically no firing, it was impossible to stop the loco. blowing off every time the regulator was shut. Quite a change from the run this loco. made in December, 1952, on the Yorkshire Pullman, when the pressure hardly ever went above the 180 lb. mark and for long periods had only 150 lb. on the clock, though, thanks to a piece of first-class enginemanship by its regular driver (E. Hailstone) no time was lost by the engine to Leeds. | SLS/195310 |
11/07/1953 | Kings Cross failures | A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. | SLS/195310 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5648 | ||
26/07/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4493, name: WOODCOCK Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1858 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
19/00/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
20/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1938. Dep: 21/01/1938. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
25/02/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
10/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1938. Dep: 25/07/1938. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
25/07/1938 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
09/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1939. Dep: 25/09/1939. | ||
20/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. | ||
30/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1942. Dep: 11/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29280 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
11/09/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
31/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
10/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
16/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1943. Dep: 13/12/1943. | ||
04/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 23/11/1944. | ||
18/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 595 but not taken up | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 29 | ||
01/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1947. Dep: 04/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8946 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
11/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1947. Dep: 19/12/1947. | ||
08/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/01/1948. Dep: 19/01/1948. | ||
28/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/02/1948. Dep: 04/03/1948. | ||
28/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8961 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60029 |
||
28/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1949. Dep: 13/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8947 (Diagram 107) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
13/01/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
10/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/10/1950. Dep: 17/10/1950. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1951. Dep: 05/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107) |
||
15/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/09/1952. Dep: 30/10/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
30/10/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
05/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1953. Dep: 09/01/1953. | ||
12/03/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5323 | ||
16/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955. | ||
10/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955. | ||
12/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1955. Dep: 19/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29292 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1957. Dep: 21/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29313 (Diagram 107) |
||
23/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1957. Dep: 27/02/1957. | ||
12/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
26/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1960. Dep: 08/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29336 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
24/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1960. Dep: 18/11/1960. | ||
19/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/06/1961. Dep: 15/07/1961. | ||
06/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1961. Dep: 13/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107) |
||
22/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1962. Dep: 06/06/1962. | ||
06/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
03/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1963. Dep: 02/08/1963. | ||
20/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60029 from New England (34E) | ||
04/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |