|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1937 | 25/09/1937 | 15 days | Unclassified | Re-painting green to blue and re-naming Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. De-named GREAT SNIPE Named GOLDEN FLEECE |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1937 | 07/12/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | Larger coal space provided |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1938 | 11/11/1938 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1940 | 12/04/1940 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1941 | 20/12/1941 | 45 days | General | Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1942 | 22/11/1942 | 31 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9019 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1945 | 07/04/1945 | 45 days | General | Tender number 5652 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 33 days | General | Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 30 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1947 | 18/04/1947 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1948 | 16/01/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1948 | 30/07/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9024 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Renumbered to BR 60030 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1949 | 10/11/1949 | 46 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/02/1951 | 17/03/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1951 | 16/08/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1952 | 24/09/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1953 | 15/01/1953 | 7 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1954 | 28/04/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1954 | 04/11/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1955 | 12/01/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1955 | 14/10/1955 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29313 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1956 | 23/01/1957 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29316 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1958 | 15/05/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1959 | 20/02/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1959 | 18/06/1959 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1959 | 18/11/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27962 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1960 | 27/04/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1960 | 19/11/1960 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1961 | 02/03/1961 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1961 | 28/07/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1961 | 15/12/1961 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1962 | 16/03/1962 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1962 | 01/09/1962 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
31/10/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. | SLS/194912 |
09/06/1951 | \"A4\" activity | A4 No. 60029 Woodcock, off works W/E, 9th June, will probably be nursed so as to be fit for the first non-stop 'Capitals Limited' when it eventually starts : Nos. 60017 an 60022 are possible spares, and there is also talk of giving No. 60030 a corridor tender for the same purpose. A4's continue to hold their own on the top main-line jobs; the two Pullmans (the Yorkshire and the Tees-Tyne) are more often than not hauled by them. | SLS/195107 |
11/07/1953 | Kings Cross failures | A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. | SLS/195310 |
11/07/1953 | A4 steaming problems rectified | After some long time, and many complaints, bad steaming by several London A4's has at last been cured. The trouble came to a head as a result of No. 60030, with a spare driver, sitting down on the main line just north of Barnet for a 'blow up.' The two regular drivers of this' loco. had long known how bad she was, but had learned to cope. However, extensive tests were carried out with No. 60033 and as a result, certain alterations were made to the blast pipes on the worst culprits, 60010/29/30 being three of those done. The effect on 60030 has been reported as phenomenal by one fireman, who claimed that with practically no firing, it was impossible to stop the loco. blowing off every time the regulator was shut. Quite a change from the run this loco. made in December, 1952, on the Yorkshire Pullman, when the pressure hardly ever went above the 180 lb. mark and for long periods had only 150 lb. on the clock, though, thanks to a piece of first-class enginemanship by its regular driver (E. Hailstone) no time was lost by the engine to Leeds. | SLS/195310 |
28/06/1954 | G.N. notes | With the Summer Service proper, starting on 28th June, interest is again focussed on the 'Elizabethan,' accelerated this year to a 6½-hour schedule. This year it was decided to keep two A4's specially for this job, one to work the train and the other as stand-by. The system previously adopted, of letting the men take their own loco. on this train, has been dropped, presumably because of the extra labour and worry involved in seeing that nine different engines are brought to and maintained in a good enough condition to do the non-stop run just for one week only in each case. Some of the regular engines have got in good mileages (over 80,000 since shopping in one case), and although in an emergency any of them could be relied upon to get through, it is obviously going to be easier to keep two only in good shape. The locos. chosen, both non-regular ones, Nos. 60030 an 60032, are recently ex-works, and the first Down train on Monday 28th was worked by 60030 and the up train by No. 60009 of Haymarket. These two completed the first week without untoward incident, No. 60030 on her first up trip arriving seven minutes early after a journey including at least eight bad P.W. checks. The stand-by engine 60032 has worked a train out and back daily, after seeing the non-stop safely on its way. | SLS/195408 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/08/1937 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4495, name: GREAT SNIPE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1860 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: LNER Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
11/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937. Work undertaken: Re-painting green to blue and re-naming Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. De-named GREAT SNIPE Named GOLDEN FLEECE |
||
24/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
25/09/1937 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
06/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/12/1937. Dep: 07/12/1937. Work undertaken: Larger coal space provided |
||
01/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 11/11/1938. | ||
03/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
21/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 12/04/1940. | ||
06/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941. Work undertaken: Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
02/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
23/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1942. Dep: 22/11/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
22/11/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
25/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9019 (Diagram 107) |
||
22/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 5652 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 597 but not taken up | ||
05/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 30 |
||
16/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1947. Dep: 18/04/1947. | ||
03/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1948. Dep: 16/01/1948. | ||
17/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1948. Dep: 30/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9024 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. Renumbered to BR 60030 |
||
26/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1949. Dep: 10/11/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
10/11/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
08/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) |
||
30/06/1951 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5327 | ||
23/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/07/1951. Dep: 16/08/1951. | ||
13/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1952. Dep: 24/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
24/09/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
09/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1953. Dep: 15/01/1953. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 28/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
27/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954. | ||
10/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 12/01/1955. | ||
30/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1955. Dep: 14/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29313 (Diagram 107) |
||
05/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1956. Dep: 23/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29316 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1958. Dep: 15/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
13/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1959. Dep: 20/02/1959. | ||
30/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1959. Dep: 18/06/1959. | ||
12/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1959. Dep: 18/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27962 (Diagram 107) |
||
02/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 27/04/1960. | ||
15/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/10/1960. Dep: 19/11/1960. | ||
13/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1961. Dep: 02/03/1961. | ||
13/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1961. Dep: 28/07/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29286 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
11/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1961. Dep: 15/12/1961. | ||
19/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/02/1962. Dep: 16/03/1962. | ||
07/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1962. Dep: 01/09/1962. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60030 from Kings Cross (34A) | ||
25/01/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |