Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 5 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 3393 Week
» 16426 Month
» 238827 Year
» 1123208 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 4496   04/09/1937
LNER (1946 1st) 598   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 8   23/11/1946
BR 60008   29/10/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/09/1937 GOLDEN SHUTTLE (removed 04/07/1945)
25/09/1945 DWIGHT D EISENHOWER

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 04/09/1937
LNER Black Unlined 30/01/1942
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 12/03/1943
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 25/09/1945
BR Blue Black and White 14/06/1950
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 09/11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 341
Works Number 1861
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Sat 04/09/1937
Withdrawal Sat 20/07/1963 off New England (34E)
Service Life 25 yrs, 10 mths , 16 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
LNER Corridor 5651 04/09/1937 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5671 01/04/1957 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Shipped to USA 27/4/64. Now in museum at Green Bay, Wisconsin

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster 20/09/1937
KX Kings Cross 29/09/1937
GRA Grantham 04/12/1939
34A Kings Cross 04/06/1950
35B Grantham 07/04/1957
34A Kings Cross 15/09/1957
34E New England 16/06/1963
   Withdrawn 20/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   20/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/09/1937 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8959)
30/01/1942 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8945)
30/01/1942 Side skirting removed
03/06/1944 To 75% Cut-off
23/11/1946 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8906)
14/06/1950 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8955)
23/06/1950 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
09/11/1951 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29314)
18/06/1954 Long guard irons removed
18/06/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29303)
08/07/1955 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29296)
20/12/1956 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29308)
20/08/1958 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29312)
20/08/1958 Double Chimney fitted
30/06/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27964)
30/06/1960 Speedometer fitted
17/05/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29335)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 08/12/1937 10/12/1937 3 days Light Repair
Larger coal space provided
 
Doncaster Works 01/10/1938 15/11/1938 46 days General  
Doncaster Works 21/02/1940 12/04/1940 52 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/02/1941 13/03/1941 37 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 10/12/1941 30/01/1942 52 days General
Boiler number 8945 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Doncaster Works 12/02/1943 12/03/1943 29 days General
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 29/04/1944 03/06/1944 36 days General
To 75% Cut-off
 
Doncaster Works 25/11/1944 09/12/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 04/07/1945 25/09/1945 84 days General
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
De-named GOLDEN SHUTTLE
Named DWIGHT D EISENHOWER
 
Doncaster Works 16/10/1946 23/11/1946 39 days General
Boiler number 8906 (Diagram 107)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 8
 
Doncaster Works 17/12/1947 06/01/1948 21 days 1  
Doncaster Works 16/09/1948 29/10/1948 44 days General
Renumbered to BR 60008
 
Doncaster Works 02/05/1950 14/06/1950 44 days General
Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 21/06/1950 23/06/1950 3 days Unclassified
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 24/07/1950 25/07/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 15/11/1950 21/11/1950 7 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 09/10/1951 09/11/1951 32 days General
Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 03/02/1953 05/03/1953 31 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 17/05/1954 18/06/1954 33 days General
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 14/07/1954 22/07/1954 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 04/01/1955 10/01/1955 7 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 05/05/1955 08/07/1955 65 days General
Boiler number 8907 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 12/11/1956 20/12/1956 39 days General
Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 03/07/1958 20/08/1958 49 days General
Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 25/09/1959 30/10/1959 36 days Heavy Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/05/1960 30/06/1960 57 days General
Boiler number 27964 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 19/11/1960 10/12/1960 22 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 22/07/1961 19/08/1961 29 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 28/03/1962 17/05/1962 51 days General
Boiler number 29335 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 22/01/1963 22/02/1963 32 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/07/1963 19/07/1963 1 day No repairs
Restored but not repaired
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/09/1937 To Service To service as LNER Number 4496, name: GOLDEN SHUTTLE
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1861
Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Tender fitted: LNER Corridor
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
20/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
08/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1937. Dep: 10/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space provided
   
01/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 15/11/1938.    
04/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1940. Dep: 12/04/1940.    
05/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1941. Dep: 13/03/1941.    
10/12/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1941. Dep: 30/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8945 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
12/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1943. Dep: 12/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
29/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
To 75% Cut-off
   
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944.    
04/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1945. Dep: 25/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
De-named GOLDEN SHUTTLE
Named DWIGHT D EISENHOWER
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 598 but not taken up    
16/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8906 (Diagram 107)
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 8
   
17/12/1947 Works Visit      
16/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1948. Dep: 29/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60008
   
02/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8955 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
21/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1950. Dep: 23/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
24/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1950. Dep: 25/07/1950.    
15/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1950. Dep: 21/11/1950.    
09/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1951. Dep: 09/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
03/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/02/1953. Dep: 05/03/1953.    
17/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29303 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
   
14/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1954. Dep: 22/07/1954.    
04/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/01/1955. Dep: 10/01/1955.    
05/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8907 (Diagram 107)
   
12/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 20/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107)
   
01/04/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5671    
07/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
03/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29312 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
25/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1959. Dep: 30/10/1959.    
05/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1960. Dep: 30/06/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27964 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
19/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960.    
22/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961.    
28/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1962. Dep: 17/05/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29335 (Diagram 107)
   
22/01/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1963. Dep: 22/02/1963.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
19/07/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 19/07/1963. Dep: 19/07/1963.
Work undertaken:
Restored but not repaired
   
20/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60008 from New England (34E)    

prev prev