Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 136 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4648 Week
» 27154 Month
» 330344 Year
» 1551909 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1943) 4462 on 10/12/1937
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 601 on Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 4   25/08/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E4   20/01/1948
British Railways 60004   25/05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/12/1937 GREAT SNIPE (removed 05/06/1941)
23/07/1941 WILLIAM WHITELAW

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 10/12/1937
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 31/10/1942
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 14/11/1946
BR Blue Black and White 10/08/1950
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 29/02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 341A
Works Number 1864
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Sun 10/12/1937 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Sun 17/07/1966 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 28 yrs, 7 mths , 7 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5667 10/12/1937 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5323 23/07/1941 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5639 04/02/1948 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5484 25/05/1948 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wishaw, 10/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) on 10/12/1937
GHD Gateshead on 16/02/1938
HTN Heaton on 17/06/1940
HAY Haymarket on 24/07/1941
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
on 11/06/1962
64B Haymarket on 20/09/1962
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
on 17/06/1963
   Withdrawn on 17/07/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 5w/e 13/10/1962
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 13/07/1963
WDN   on 17/07/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/12/1937 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9018)
23/07/1941 Side skirting removed
03/09/1941 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
31/10/1942 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9029)
19/04/1944 To 75% Cut-off
26/04/1949 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9126)
10/08/1950 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9129)
29/02/1952 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29311)
22/05/1953 Long guard irons removed
28/03/1956 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29289)
05/12/1957 Double Chimney fitted
05/12/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29302)
13/11/1958 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
16/04/1959 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29330)
25/01/1961 Speedometer fitted
25/01/1961 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29333)
31/12/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29307)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 14/01/1938 31/01/1938 18 days Light Repair
Larger coal space provided
 
Doncaster Works 11/02/1938 14/02/1938 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/01/1939 11/02/1939 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/02/1940 27/04/1940 62 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/06/1941 23/07/1941 49 days General
Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Side skirting removed
De-named GREAT SNIPE
Named WILLIAM WHITELAW
 
Doncaster Works 26/08/1941 03/09/1941 9 days Light Repair
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 16/09/1942 31/10/1942 46 days General
Boiler number 9029 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 10/03/1944 19/04/1944 41 days General
To 75% Cut-off
 
Doncaster Works 13/03/1945 31/03/1945 19 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 05/09/1945 27/10/1945 53 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/10/1946 14/11/1946 45 days General
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 04/12/1947 20/01/1948 48 days General
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4
 
Doncaster Works 03/02/1948 04/02/1948 2 days Special
Tender change
Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 24/05/1948 25/05/1948 2 days Special
Tender change
Tender number 5484 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60004
 
Doncaster Works 28/07/1948 06/08/1948 10 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 08/11/1948 19/11/1948 12 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 11/03/1949 26/04/1949 47 days General
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 10/07/1950 10/08/1950 32 days General
Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 21/01/1952 29/02/1952 40 days General
Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 22/04/1953 22/05/1953 31 days General
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 23/08/1954 06/10/1954 45 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 02/03/1955 21/03/1955 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 18/02/1956 28/03/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107)
 
Cowlairs Works 11/07/1956 11/07/1956 1 day Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/01/1957 31/01/1957 18 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/11/1957 05/12/1957 31 days General
Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Cowlairs Works 25/06/1958 27/06/1958 3 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1958 13/11/1958 10 days Light Casual
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 05/03/1959 16/04/1959 43 days General
Boiler number 29330 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 31/05/1960 08/06/1960 9 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 05/12/1960 25/01/1961 52 days General
Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 07/02/1961 11/02/1961 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 13/11/1962 31/12/1962 49 days General
Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107)
 
Darlington Works 11/12/1963 06/02/1964 58 days Heavy Casual  
Inverurie Works 13/02/1964 13/02/1964 1 day Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/07/1965 28/08/1965 55 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
30/04/1949 Doncaster Works Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. SLS/194906
29/06/1953 Elizabethan Express The first 'Elizabethan' from London was in charge of A4 60028 and Driver J. Howard, and both arrived on time and intact at Edinburgh despite the combined efforts of the reporters and television cameras. Up to quite a late hour it was hoped that 60022 would be able to do the trip but several failures of minor and major importance had made the prospect unlikely, then a final test a day or two beforehand still showed a tendency for one of the motion pins to run warm, and so 60028, fairly new ex works, was quickly made ready. So far, the first month has produced only one failure; a trailing bogie on 60008 ran hot (on Monday the 13th) on her first down run, and at Dunbar a D49 took over for the short run to Edinburgh. One of the Haymarket locos., No. 60009 was suspected of being a little warm on arrival at Kings Cross, during the second week, and 60028 was sent in its place the next morning (60017 had previously taken over the Kings X working leaving 60028 in reserve), 60009 returned on its right working later. This loco. had earlier worked the first Up train, a run spoilt by a piece of cotton waste blocking the water pick-up, causing a stop at Retford for a. 'drink.' Good work by Driver Smith thereafter reduced the late arrival to only five or six minutes. 60004 has performed well from the Edinburgh end (though reported a little weak at the front end), with some help from 60031. SLS/195310
19/12/1960 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. SLS/196102
25/02/1962 Derby MPD Ex-Works on Shed: D155/6, D3174, D3292, 42306/22/35, 42400, 44165/79, 44241, 44403, 44580, 47250/89, 4/375, 47461/99, 47543/65, 48367, 48678. SLS/196204
02/02/1963 Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. SLS/196303
14/04/1963 St. Rollox MPD (in steam) in steam-60004/31/94, 60955 and 60525 under repair, and stored-42877, 45119, 45718/28/9/31; ex Works-44931, 45309 an 45478. SLS/196304
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (under repair) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5667    
10/12/1937 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4462, name: GREAT SNIPE
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1864
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
14/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1938. Dep: 31/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Larger coal space provided
   
11/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/02/1938. Dep: 14/02/1938.    
16/02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
02/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1939. Dep: 11/02/1939.    
26/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940.    
17/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
05/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1941. Dep: 23/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Side skirting removed
De-named GREAT SNIPE
Named WILLIAM WHITELAW
   
24/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
26/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1941. Dep: 03/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
16/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9029 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
10/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1944. Dep: 19/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
To 75% Cut-off
   
13/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945.    
05/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 601 but not taken up    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 4    
01/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1946. Dep: 14/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
14/11/1946 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
04/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1947. Dep: 20/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E4
   
03/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 03/02/1948. Dep: 04/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender change
Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
   
24/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 25/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender change
Tender number 5484 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Renumbered to BR 60004
   
28/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1948. Dep: 06/08/1948.    
08/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1948. Dep: 19/11/1948.    
11/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 26/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9126 (Diagram 107)
   
10/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9129 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
21/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
22/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1953. Dep: 22/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Long guard irons removed
   
23/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 06/10/1954.    
02/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 21/03/1955.    
18/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1956. Dep: 28/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29289 (Diagram 107)
   
11/07/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1956. Dep: 11/07/1956.    
14/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1957. Dep: 31/01/1957.    
05/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1957. Dep: 05/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
25/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1958. Dep: 27/06/1958.    
04/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 13/11/1958.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
05/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29330 (Diagram 107)
   
31/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/05/1960. Dep: 08/06/1960.    
05/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1960. Dep: 25/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
07/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1961. Dep: 11/02/1961.    
11/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
20/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
13/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1962. Dep: 31/12/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29307 (Diagram 107)
   
17/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
11/12/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1963. Dep: 06/02/1964.    
13/02/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1964. Dep: 13/02/1964.    
05/07/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1965. Dep: 28/08/1965.    
17/07/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60004 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev prev