Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 711 Today
» 1118 Yesterday
» 4347 Week
» 23992 Month
» 58634 Year
» 1280199 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 4466   26/01/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 605   26/01/1946
LNER (1946 2nd) 6   27/05/1946
BR 60006   02/12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
26/01/1938 HERRING GULL (removed 01/12/1943)
06/01/1944 SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 26/01/1938
LNER Black Unlined 13/02/1942
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 06/01/1944
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 02/04/1947
BR Blue Black and White 31/05/1950
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 17/10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 342
Works Number 1868
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Fri 26/01/1938 to Kings Cross (KX)
Withdrawal Fri 03/09/1965 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 10/1966 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)
Service Life 27 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5670 22/01/1938 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5647 05/01/1951 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5328 24/06/1953 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5647 28/07/1953 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5675 17/06/1954 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Motherwell Machinery & Scrap, Wishaw, l0/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
KX Kings Cross (New) 26/01/1938
GRA Grantham 30/04/1938
KX Kings Cross 13/08/1944
34E New England 16/06/1963
64A St Margarets 20/10/1963
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
04/05/1964
   Withdrawn 03/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 29/06/1963
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 64M   4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 25/11/1963
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 09/05/1964
WDN   w/e 03/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
26/01/1938 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9022)
13/02/1942 Side skirting removed
06/01/1944 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9030)
06/01/1944 To 75% Cut-off
31/05/1950 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8907)
01/11/1950 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
15/05/1953 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29322)
15/05/1953 Long guard irons removed
28/10/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29302)
19/01/1956 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29274)
25/09/1957 Double Chimney fitted
25/09/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 293i8)
12/08/1959 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29320)
29/12/1960 Speedometer fitted
29/12/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29334)
10/10/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27972)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 18/06/1938 30/06/1938 13 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 19/01/1939 25/02/1939 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 28/06/1939 29/06/1939 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 04/03/1940 29/04/1940 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 01/01/1942 13/02/1942 44 days General
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Doncaster Works 01/12/1943 06/01/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 9030 (Diagram 107)
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
De-named HERRING GULL
Named SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD
 
Doncaster Works 16/03/1944 28/03/1944 13 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/09/1944 30/09/1944 20 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 25/08/1945 20/10/1945 57 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/02/1947 02/04/1947 40 days General
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 21/10/1948 02/12/1948 43 days General
Renumbered to BR 60006
 
Doncaster Works 13/07/1949 08/08/1949 27 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/04/1950 31/05/1950 44 days General
Boiler number 8907 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 26/10/1950 01/11/1950 7 days Light Casual
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 28/12/1950 05/01/1951 9 days Light Casual
Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 05/09/1951 17/10/1951 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 17/02/1953 24/02/1953 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 14/04/1953 15/05/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 14/07/1953 28/07/1953 15 days Unclassified
Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 10/11/1953 10/11/1953 1 day Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 22/09/1954 28/10/1954 37 days General
Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 07/12/1955 19/01/1956 44 days General
Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 12/08/1957 25/09/1957 45 days General
Boiler number 293i8 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 12/12/1957 01/01/1958 21 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 27/03/1958 03/04/1958 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 07/07/1959 12/08/1959 37 days General
Boiler number 29320 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 15/11/1960 29/12/1960 45 days General
Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 03/08/1961 25/08/1961 23 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 10/04/1962 28/04/1962 19 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 07/08/1962 10/10/1962 65 days General
Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 23/04/1963 28/05/1963 36 days Light Casual  
Inverurie Works 22/03/1965 27/03/1965 6 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/01/1938 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5670    
26/01/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 4466, name: HERRING GULL
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1868
Allocated to Kings Cross (KX)
Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
30/04/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
18/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1938. Dep: 30/06/1938.    
19/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.    
28/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1939. Dep: 29/06/1939.    
04/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1940. Dep: 29/04/1940.    
01/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1942. Dep: 13/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
01/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1943. Dep: 06/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9030 (Diagram 107)
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
De-named HERRING GULL
Named SIR RALPH WEDGWOOD
   
16/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1944. Dep: 28/03/1944.    
13/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
11/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.    
25/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945.    
26/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 605    
27/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 6    
22/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 02/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
21/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1948. Dep: 02/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60006
   
13/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 08/08/1949.    
18/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8907 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
26/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/10/1950. Dep: 01/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
28/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/12/1950. Dep: 05/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
05/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1951. Dep: 17/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
17/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1953. Dep: 24/02/1953.    
14/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1953. Dep: 15/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107)
Long guard irons removed
   
24/06/1953 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5328    
14/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1953. Dep: 28/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5647 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
10/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1953. Dep: 10/11/1953.    
17/06/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5675    
22/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1954. Dep: 28/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29302 (Diagram 107)
   
07/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1955. Dep: 19/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29274 (Diagram 107)
   
12/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 25/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 293i8 (Diagram 107)
Double Chimney fitted
   
12/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1957. Dep: 01/01/1958.    
27/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1958. Dep: 03/04/1958.    
07/07/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1959. Dep: 12/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29320 (Diagram 107)
   
15/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1960. Dep: 29/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29334 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
03/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961.    
10/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1962. Dep: 28/04/1962.    
07/08/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1962. Dep: 10/10/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27972 (Diagram 107)
   
23/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1963. Dep: 28/05/1963.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
20/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
22/03/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1965. Dep: 27/03/1965.    
03/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 60006 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev