|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1938 | 25/07/1938 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1939 | 25/02/1939 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1940 | 10/05/1940 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1940 | 02/08/1940 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 8905 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1942 | 18/07/1942 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1942 | 20/12/1942 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1944 | 05/02/1944 | 31 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1944 | 12/10/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1945 | 22/06/1945 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1946 | 29/08/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1947 | 30/04/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9488 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1947 | 22/08/1947 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1947 | 05/02/1948 | 46 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E21 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1948 | 24/09/1948 | 47 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60021 |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1949 | 11/04/1949 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1950 | 31/03/1950 | 74 days | General | Boiler number 29293 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1950 | 15/12/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1951 | 08/08/1951 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1952 | 13/05/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1952 | 20/11/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1952 | 15/12/1952 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1954 | 10/03/1954 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29299 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1955 | 08/02/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1956 | 07/02/1956 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1957 | 08/02/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1957 | 20/02/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1958 | 30/04/1958 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1959 | 23/12/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1960 | 28/05/1960 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1960 | 22/09/1960 | 52 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1961 | 22/02/1961 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1961 | 17/11/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1962 | 12/05/1962 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/06/1962 | 13/06/1962 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/07/1962 | 08/08/1962 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1963 | 23/01/1963 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1948 | Doncaster Works | 'A.2' No. E527 Sun Chariot was ready for trial at the end of January last and No. E528 Tudor Minstrel was ready for trial on 6/2, when Nos. E529 and E530 were well in hand. 'A.4' No. 21 Wild Swan, 'A.3' No. 112 St. Simon, 'J.50' No. 8929, and several 'V.2's' have appeared with the prefix 'E' and lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS.' | SLS/194803 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
11/07/1953 | Kings Cross failures | A sudden spate of failures early in the month put Kings X loco. in a spot; Nos. 60006/7/15/26 were some of the worst casualties, and of these only 60015 has yet returned to traffic. 60010/3/21/30 have also been missing during this period, involving much double-tripping for those left running to the extent of over 500 miles in less than twelve hours in some cases. Other failures include the occasion when Driver Howard (that star of television) had to leave 60007 at Hatfield and bring the Up Tees-Tyne into Kings X behind an N2, complete with headboard. Oh, shame ! The Tees-Tyne suffered again on 29/7/53 when 60033 came off at Hitchin with a hot R. hand driving box; 61097 substituted and the train was 16 mins. late on arrival. On 25/7 60029 on the Up Scotsman came off with a warm trailing pony truck at Hatfield and an N2 again took over. | SLS/195310 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/02/1938 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4467, name: WILD SWAN Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1869 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor Diagram 107 boiler fitted |
||
20/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1938. Dep: 25/07/1938. | ||
19/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939. | ||
04/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 10/05/1940. | ||
27/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1940. Dep: 02/08/1940. | ||
17/08/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8905 (Diagram 107) Side skirting removed Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
11/04/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
08/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1942. Dep: 18/07/1942. | ||
03/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1942. Dep: 20/12/1942. | ||
21/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
06/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender |
||
05/02/1944 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender | ||
13/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
05/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1944. Dep: 12/10/1944. | ||
24/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1945. Dep: 22/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 606 but not taken up | ||
01/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/04/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. | ||
25/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 21 | ||
15/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1946. Dep: 29/08/1946. | ||
21/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1947. Dep: 30/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9488 (Diagram 107) Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. |
||
30/04/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining. | ||
14/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1947. Dep: 22/08/1947. | ||
22/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1947. Dep: 05/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E21 |
||
21/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
27/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
09/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1948. Dep: 24/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60021 |
||
31/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1949. Dep: 11/04/1949. | ||
17/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 31/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29293 (Diagram 107) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
22/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1950. Dep: 15/12/1950. | ||
04/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 08/08/1951. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 13/05/1952. | ||
15/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1952. Dep: 20/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) |
||
08/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/12/1952. Dep: 15/12/1952. | ||
23/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1954. Dep: 10/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29299 (Diagram 107) Long guard irons removed |
||
01/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/02/1955. Dep: 08/02/1955. | ||
03/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29298 (Diagram 107) To 75% Cut-off |
||
16/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1956. Dep: 07/02/1956. | ||
03/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1957. Dep: 08/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
||
16/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1957. Dep: 20/02/1957. | ||
01/04/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5651 | ||
14/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1958. Dep: 30/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
21/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1959. Dep: 23/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29321 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1960. Dep: 28/05/1960. | ||
02/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1960. Dep: 22/09/1960. | ||
31/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1961. Dep: 22/02/1961. | ||
10/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107) Speedometer fitted |
||
30/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1962. Dep: 12/05/1962. | ||
30/05/1962 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5330 | ||
07/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1962. Dep: 13/06/1962. | ||
16/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/07/1962. Dep: 08/08/1962. | ||
01/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/01/1963. Dep: 23/01/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
20/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60021 from New England (34E) | ||
04/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |