Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 28 Today
» 1116 Yesterday
» 28 Week
» 14285 Month
» 242169 Year
» 1463734 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 4468 on 03/03/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 607 on Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 22   29/09/1946
BR (BR Tmp) E22   05/03/1948
BR 60022   16/09/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/03/1938 MALLARD

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 03/03/1938
LNER Black Unlined 13/06/1942
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 21/10/1943
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 05/03/1948
BR Blue Black and White 16/09/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 04/07/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 342
Works Number 1870
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum Brake
To Service Thu 03/03/1938 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Thu 25/04/1963 off Kings Cross (34A)
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5642 03/03/1938 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5639 05/05/1939 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5323 05/03/1948 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5648 12/03/1953 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5330 27/08/1958 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5651 30/05/1962 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Double chimney from new
Fitted with tender 5670, for museum display - This tender was renumbered 5642 from 9/5/63
For preservation in museum

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 03/03/1938
GRA Grantham 21/10/1943
KX Kings Cross 11/04/1948
   Withdrawn 25/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross w/e 17/04/1948
WDN   25/04/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/03/1938 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9024)
13/06/1942 Side skirting removed
13/06/1942 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8959)
01/08/1946 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8907)
05/03/1948 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8948)
05/03/1948 To 75% Cut-off
16/09/1949 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8957)
10/01/1951 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29282)
04/07/1952 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29301)
10/02/1953 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
08/05/1953 Long guard irons removed
23/04/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29315)
07/06/1957 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29328)
27/08/1958 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29308)
09/03/1960 Speedometer fitted
09/03/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29310)
10/08/1961 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27965)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 Doncaster Works Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. SLS/194805
04/07/1948 Locomotives Trials Trialed on the ex L.N.E.R. Southern Area up to 4/7, have been: 'A.4' Nos. 22, 60033/34 and 'B.1' Nos. 61251/66. SLS/194808
09/06/1951 \"A4\" activity A4 No. 60029 Woodcock, off works W/E, 9th June, will probably be nursed so as to be fit for the first non-stop 'Capitals Limited' when it eventually starts : Nos. 60017 an 60022 are possible spares, and there is also talk of giving No. 60030 a corridor tender for the same purpose. A4's continue to hold their own on the top main-line jobs; the two Pullmans (the Yorkshire and the Tees-Tyne) are more often than not hauled by them. SLS/195107
02/07/1951 Capitals Limited The first two 'Capitals Limited' on 2/7/51 were worked by 60022 Mallard (Down) and 60027 Merlin (Up), both in beautiful condition. 60027 on the up train passed Potters Bar, going very fast, at 4.49, well on time. Both were still going strong on Thursday 5/7/51. SLS/195108
07/08/1951 Unusual K.X. arrivals On 7/8/51 the 12.53 p.m. arrival (ex Hull) reached King's Cross at 2.8 behind B1 's 61331 an 61094, followed at 2.20 by the Newcastle due at 1.31. This was hauled by 61972 of 35A. The 1.41 and 1.51 Newcastle and Sunderland trains, the 2.2 Leeds and 2.12 T.T. Pullman then followed at intervals as circumstances permitted. The next day the 1.30 p.m. arrival ex Newcastle was booked 1 hr. 40 mins. late at 2.15 and the Grantham crew who work this turn would have to step lively to get to the end of No. 10 platform by 3.30 p.m., their booked return working. When this occurred on another recent occasion, they arrived after 3.20 and went straight round to No. 10 just in time to take over from the relief King's Cross crew who were preparing to take the train out. A day or two before the holiday, the T.T. Pullman, running very late, arrived at K.X. about 5 p.m. behind 60076 (still green). The turn round was made very slickly and the train left again within 25 mins. The 'Capitals' has run very well lately and Haymarket have kept 60027 going for an unbroken spell of two weeks. On the K.X. end 60022 has performed very well, and is now being rested while 60029 takes her turn. On Saturday 4/8/51 the 8.8 p.m. arrival from Peterboro' passed Potters Bar at 7.50 behind 43080 (35A), believed to be the first recorded visit of one of these on a passenger train in the London area. SLS/195110
14/06/1952 \"Capitals\" A.4\'s During the first week of the Summer service the 'Capitals' was worked by No. 60017 from the Kings X end and No. 60027 from Edinburgh. This year it had been arranged that the Kings X men should work this train with their own engines; an idea about which the men, at least, were enthusiasts There seemed every chance that the scheme might work too as the regular engines have been maintained in fine condition of late, failures on the road with one being virtually unknown. However, the second week when 60007 should have been the engine, 60033 was sent instead as the former was giving some anxiety over the amount of oil it was using. 60033 also did its own turn the following week. 60028 an 60010 should have worked the fourth and fifth weeks respectively but 60017 did both weeks. No. 60017 is, in fact, spare at the moment as its two regular drivers (Messrs. Burgess and Smith) have taken over 60022, recently out of works and painted green. No. 60027 from the Edinburgh end has worked the train (and its equivalent Sunday working) daily without a break for the five weeks mentioned above, and so far shows no signs of ceasing to do so. All the drivers who have handled it say it is in superb condition. SLS/195209
26/07/1952 Speed Trials In addition to the speed trials previously recorded, two further sets of trials have been carried out between London (K. X) and Doncaster and Leeds, with trains of between 250 and 500 Tons at various schedules. The first series, during week ended 26/7/52, were run by No. 60056, Driver E. Hailstone again being on the footplate. Apart from the Monday when the trial ended ignominiously at Knebworth with injector trouble, several notable runs were made. On the Tuesday, Leeds (186 miles) was reached in 178 minutes with a train of 365 tons, and on this occasion Doncaster was passed (156 miles in 144 minutes; speeds in excess of 90 m.p.h. being attained several times during this run. For the series as a whole the limit on many parts of the track was lifted to 90, by the engineers. On Wednesday No. 60056 with 450 Tons did the 156 miles from Doncaster in 143 minutes. The second series run during week ended 6/9/52 began on the Monday with Driver Burgess and his own engine No. 60022, not long out of works after general overhaul. However, Mallard ran hot near Corby on the first Down train, and that run was abandoned. On the Tuesday, No. 60056 was 10 minutes late on the return journey, on a schedule of 139 minutes from Doncaster. On Wednesday No. 60007 kept time with 300 Tons, being allowed 143 minutes Down and 144 Up; the next day No. 60056 again with 250 Tons, kept to the schedule of 139 minutes Down and Up. Altogether these trials are very encouraging from the point of view of the Railway enthusiast, and lead one to hope that the rumours of a possible re-introduction of high-speed trains during Coronation year will indeed prove correct. If so, there appear to be good grounds for confidence in the locomotives and crews to play their part in an enthusiastic attempt to restore to British Railways the leading place they once held in the world. SLS/195211
18/04/1953 Hpeed Trials - further info With further reference to last year's speed trials, our original correspondent remarks: 'The original notes did not mention high-speed trials, but that they were speed trials is still true (even if officially called timing trials). In this connection it should be remembered that the speed trials of the 1930's were usually given the official designation 'braking tests.' In the present instance, the intention was to sustain a speed of 85 m.p.h. over most of the run, no more and no less, apart from regular P.W. restrictions, and it was for this purpose that the speed limit over the line was raised to 90 m.p.h. generally, for these tests. Such speeds surely justify the description used, especially in view of the mediocrity of the great majority of post-war schedules. 'In addition it is doubtful whether A1's could 'easily better these times,' as was stated; there are no runs on record, known to the writer, which give any grounds for this statement, and no driver has claimed to have touched 95 m.p.h. four times between London and Leeds, as 60056 in fact did. Even though an A1 could do as well it does not follow that it could easily do better. 'As regards A4's and speedometers, 60028 was fitted for the trials at first, but being fairly new out of shops would have given a better than average performance and so 60003 with 50,000 miles to her credit, was fitted instead. In the last set of trials choice of loco was upset by the failure of 60022 on the first day, and the fact that on very few A4's do the speedometers work, and it is easier to fit a new and reliable one, rather than patch up those fitted.' SLS/195306
29/06/1953 Elizabethan Express The first 'Elizabethan' from London was in charge of A4 60028 and Driver J. Howard, and both arrived on time and intact at Edinburgh despite the combined efforts of the reporters and television cameras. Up to quite a late hour it was hoped that 60022 would be able to do the trip but several failures of minor and major importance had made the prospect unlikely, then a final test a day or two beforehand still showed a tendency for one of the motion pins to run warm, and so 60028, fairly new ex works, was quickly made ready. So far, the first month has produced only one failure; a trailing bogie on 60008 ran hot (on Monday the 13th) on her first down run, and at Dunbar a D49 took over for the short run to Edinburgh. One of the Haymarket locos., No. 60009 was suspected of being a little warm on arrival at Kings Cross, during the second week, and 60028 was sent in its place the next morning (60017 had previously taken over the Kings X working leaving 60028 in reserve), 60009 returned on its right working later. This loco. had earlier worked the first Up train, a run spoilt by a piece of cotton waste blocking the water pick-up, causing a stop at Retford for a. 'drink.' Good work by Driver Smith thereafter reduced the late arrival to only five or six minutes. 60004 has performed well from the Edinburgh end (though reported a little weak at the front end), with some help from 60031. SLS/195310
02/07/1961 Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196108
16/07/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196109

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 15/09/1938 23/09/1938 9 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 31/10/1938 03/11/1938 4 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 14/03/1939 05/05/1939 53 days General
Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 18/05/1939 24/05/1939 7 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 09/12/1940 16/01/1941 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 02/05/1942 13/06/1942 43 days General
Boiler number 8959 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Doncaster Works 16/09/1943 21/10/1943 36 days General
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 26/02/1944 13/03/1944 17 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 08/02/1945 23/03/1945 44 days General  
Doncaster Works 11/06/1946 01/08/1946 52 days General
Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 22/11/1947 05/12/1947 14 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/01/1948 05/03/1948 50 days General
Boiler number 8948 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached.
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E22
 
Doncaster Works 05/04/1948 08/04/1948 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 07/05/1948 13/05/1948 7 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/05/1948 21/05/1948 4 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 10/06/1948 25/06/1948 16 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 28/06/1948 30/06/1948 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 18/07/1949 16/09/1949 61 days General
Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
Renumbered to BR 60022
 
Doncaster Works 04/12/1950 10/01/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 01/05/1951 28/05/1951 28 days Unclassified
Special painting
 
Doncaster Works 15/10/1951 15/10/1951 1 day Weighing  
Doncaster Works 27/05/1952 04/07/1952 39 days General
Boiler number 29301 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 03/02/1953 10/02/1953 8 days Unclassified
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 29/04/1953 08/05/1953 10 days Unclassified
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 04/03/1954 23/04/1954 51 days General
Boiler number 29315 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 22/11/1954 11/12/1954 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 12/10/1955 25/11/1955 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1957 07/06/1957 45 days General
Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 16/10/1957 16/10/1957 1 day Weighing  
Doncaster Works 21/07/1958 27/08/1958 38 days General
Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 25/01/1960 09/03/1960 45 days General
Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 12/07/1960 04/08/1960 24 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 25/04/1961 04/05/1961 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 27/06/1961 10/08/1961 45 days General
Boiler number 27965 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 05/03/1962 29/03/1962 25 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/06/1962 15/06/1962 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 22/11/1962 19/12/1962 28 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 23/04/1963 23/04/1963 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/03/1938 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 4468, name: MALLARD
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1870
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
15/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1938. Dep: 23/09/1938.    
31/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1938. Dep: 03/11/1938.    
14/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1939. Dep: 05/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5639 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
   
18/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1939. Dep: 24/05/1939.    
09/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1940. Dep: 16/01/1941.    
02/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8959 (Diagram 107)
Side skirting removed
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
13/06/1942 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black    
16/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1943. Dep: 21/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
21/10/1943 Livery Change of livery to Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender    
21/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
26/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1944. Dep: 13/03/1944.    
08/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1945. Dep: 23/03/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 607 but not taken up    
11/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1946. Dep: 01/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29296 (Diagram 107)
   
29/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 22    
22/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 05/12/1947.    
16/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8948 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached.
To 75% Cut-off
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E22
   
05/03/1948 Livery Change of livery to Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.    
05/04/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1948. Dep: 08/04/1948.    
11/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
07/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1948. Dep: 13/05/1948.    
18/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948.    
10/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/06/1948. Dep: 25/06/1948.    
28/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/06/1948. Dep: 30/06/1948.    
18/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1949. Dep: 16/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8957 (Diagram 107)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
Renumbered to BR 60022
   
04/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1950. Dep: 10/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29282 (Diagram 107)
   
01/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/05/1951. Dep: 28/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Special painting
   
15/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/10/1951. Dep: 15/10/1951.    
27/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 04/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29301 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
03/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1953. Dep: 10/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
12/03/1953 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5648    
29/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1953. Dep: 08/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Long guard irons removed
   
04/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 23/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29315 (Diagram 107)
   
22/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954.    
12/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1955. Dep: 25/11/1955.    
24/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29328 (Diagram 107)
   
16/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/10/1957. Dep: 16/10/1957.    
21/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1958. Dep: 27/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29308 (Diagram 107)
Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
25/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1960. Dep: 09/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
12/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1960. Dep: 04/08/1960.    
25/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1961. Dep: 04/05/1961.    
27/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1961. Dep: 10/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27965 (Diagram 107)
   
05/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1962. Dep: 29/03/1962.    
30/05/1962 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5651    
14/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/06/1962. Dep: 15/06/1962.    
22/11/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1962. Dep: 19/12/1962.    
23/04/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/04/1963. Dep: 23/04/1963.    
25/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60022 from Kings Cross (34A)    

prev prev