Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 448 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6202 Week
» 34160 Month
» 68802 Year
» 1290367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1943) 4903   01/07/1938
LNER (1946 1st) 613   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 34   03/11/1946
BR 60034   24/03/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/07/1938 PEREGRINE (removed 21/03/1948)
24/03/1948 LORD FARINGDON

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 01/07/1938
LNER Black Unlined - NE on tender 14/09/1942
LNER Garter blue Narrow red and white 10/12/1947
BR Blue Black and White 04/12/1950
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 07/08/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer N. Gresley
Class A4
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 343
Works Number 1877
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Wed 01/07/1938 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Wed 24/08/1966 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5639 01/07/1938 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5642 09/06/1939 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5332 25/02/1948 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5325 28/05/1954 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5640 28/01/1963 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5329 24/08/1966 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Fitted with Double chimney from new
Tender 5329 attached for scrapping
Sold for scrap to Hughes, Bolckow, Blyth 10/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 01/07/1938
KX Kings Cross 25/07/1942
GRA Grantham 05/10/1942
KX Kings Cross 11/04/1948
34E New England 16/06/1963
64A St Margarets 20/10/1963
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill
(Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)
17/05/1964
   Withdrawn 24/08/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KX Kings Cross w/e 17/04/1948
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 29/06/1963
LOAN 91X To Scottish Region 4w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 64A St Margarets 4w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 91X To Scottish Region 25/11/1963
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 13/06/1964
WDN   24/08/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/12/1940 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8951)
14/09/1942 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 9024)
10/12/1947 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 8960)
25/02/1948 To 75% Cut-off
07/08/1952 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29283)
11/11/1952 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
07/02/1953 Long guard irons removed
13/01/1954 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29270)
21/05/1955 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29295)
10/11/1956 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29300)
29/01/1958 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29311)
14/05/1959 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29333)
02/11/1960 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 29327)
02/11/1960 Speedometer fitted
01/06/1962 Diagram 107 boiler fitted (number 27964)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 13/07/1938 15/07/1938 3 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 13/03/1939 14/03/1939 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/04/1939 09/06/1939 56 days General
Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 12/11/1940 27/12/1940 46 days General
Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 07/01/1941 01/02/1941 26 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 08/08/1942 14/09/1942 38 days General
Boiler number 9024 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
 
Doncaster Works 19/10/1943 15/11/1943 28 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 11/06/1944 15/07/1944 35 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/09/1945 26/10/1945 41 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/01/1946 06/02/1946 16 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 15/10/1947 10/12/1947 57 days General
Boiler number 8960 (Diagram 107)
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 23/01/1948 25/02/1948 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached.
To 75% Cut-off
 
Doncaster Works 21/03/1948 24/03/1948 4 days Unclassified
Renumbered to BR 60034
De-named PEREGRINE
Named LORD FARINGDON
 
Doncaster Works 03/08/1948 29/08/1948 27 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 16/03/1949 04/05/1949 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/10/1950 04/12/1950 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 24/06/1952 07/08/1952 45 days General
Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 31/10/1952 11/11/1952 12 days Unclassified
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 
Doncaster Works 01/02/1953 07/02/1953 7 days Unclassified
Long guard irons removed
 
Doncaster Works 28/11/1953 13/01/1954 47 days General
Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107)
 
Stratford Works 22/06/1954 27/06/1954 6 days Light Casual
Tender only
 
Doncaster Works 02/02/1955 04/02/1955 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 16/04/1955 21/05/1955 36 days General
Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 02/10/1956 10/11/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 19/11/1956 20/11/1956 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 29/05/1957 31/05/1957 3 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/08/1957 27/08/1957 9 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 10/12/1957 29/01/1958 51 days General
Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 10/04/1959 14/05/1959 35 days General
Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 26/09/1960 02/11/1960 38 days General
Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
 
Doncaster Works 11/07/1961 26/07/1961 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 12/04/1962 01/06/1962 51 days General
Boiler number 27964 (Diagram 107)
 
Doncaster Works 14/01/1963 21/01/1963 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 06/02/1963 07/03/1963 30 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 11/01/1965 21/04/1965 101 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/07/1938 To Service To service as LNER Number 4903, name: PEREGRINE
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1877
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Livery applied: Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor
Diagram 107 boiler fitted
   
13/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1938. Dep: 15/07/1938.    
13/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 14/03/1939.    
15/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1939. Dep: 09/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5642 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
   
12/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1940. Dep: 27/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8951 (Diagram 107)
   
07/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1941. Dep: 01/02/1941.    
25/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
08/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1942. Dep: 14/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9024 (Diagram 107)
Painted Wartime unlined black with NE lettering on tender
   
05/10/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
19/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1943. Dep: 15/11/1943.    
11/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1944. Dep: 15/07/1944.    
16/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1945. Dep: 26/10/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 613 but not taken up    
22/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1946. Dep: 06/02/1946.    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 34    
15/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1947. Dep: 10/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8960 (Diagram 107)
Painted Garter blue with black frames, red wheel centres and narrow red and white lining.
   
23/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1948. Dep: 25/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5332 (LNER Corridor) attached.
To 75% Cut-off
   
21/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 24/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60034
De-named PEREGRINE
Named LORD FARINGDON
   
11/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
03/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1948. Dep: 29/08/1948.    
16/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1949. Dep: 04/05/1949.    
23/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 04/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
24/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1952. Dep: 07/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
31/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1952. Dep: 11/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
01/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Long guard irons removed
   
28/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1953. Dep: 13/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29270 (Diagram 107)
   
28/05/1954 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325    
22/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1954. Dep: 27/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
02/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1955. Dep: 04/02/1955.    
16/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29295 (Diagram 107)
   
02/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29300 (Diagram 107)
   
19/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1956. Dep: 20/11/1956.    
29/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1957. Dep: 31/05/1957.    
19/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1957. Dep: 27/08/1957.    
10/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1957. Dep: 29/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29311 (Diagram 107)
   
10/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1959. Dep: 14/05/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29333 (Diagram 107)
   
26/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1960. Dep: 02/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29327 (Diagram 107)
Speedometer fitted
   
11/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1961. Dep: 26/07/1961.    
12/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1962. Dep: 01/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27964 (Diagram 107)
   
14/01/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1963. Dep: 21/01/1963.    
28/01/1963 Tender Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5640    
06/02/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1963. Dep: 07/03/1963.    
16/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
20/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
17/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) (Primarily used on 3hr expresses from Aberdeen - Glasgow)    
11/01/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1965. Dep: 21/04/1965.    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth    
24/08/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60034 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
24/08/1966 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329    

prev