Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 165   18/03/1911
LNER (1924) 5165   18/10/1924
LNER (1946) 9800   24/03/1946
BR 69800   05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 18/03/1911 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Mon 24/08/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 11/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 48 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) 18/03/1911
ARD Ardsley 05/01/1924
NEA Neasden 21/04/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 04/10/1938
CLK Colwick 17/08/1939
NEA Neasden 08/11/1940
ARD Ardsley 27/10/1941
NEA Neasden 30/05/1943
40B Immingham 26/03/1950
38A Colwick 23/10/1955
38C Leicester (G.C.) 15/06/1957
38D Staveley (G.C.) 26/01/1958
16D Annesley 08/06/1958
15E Leicester (G.C.) 15/06/1958
40E Colwick 11/01/1959
   Withdrawn 24/08/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 05/11/1955
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 22/02/1958
LOAN 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 15E Leicester (G.C.) 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 14/07/1958
LOAN 40E Colwick 4w/e 24/01/1959
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   24/08/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
18/03/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1419)
15/09/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1420)
18/10/1924 Side Window Cab Fitted
18/10/1924 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1421)
31/07/1926 Converted to oil burnng
02/03/1927 Oil burning equipment removed
24/09/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 343)
17/03/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
17/03/1934 Eureka lubricator fitted
28/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
28/03/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 390)
20/11/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 444)
02/03/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 718)
29/05/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 964)
03/08/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 845)
18/10/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 672)
05/03/1949 WPU Gear removed
05/03/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3848)
08/06/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22377)
12/06/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22039)
16/10/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22397)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/06/1917 15/09/1917 106 days General
Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1922 05/08/1922 71 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1924 18/10/1924 120 days General
Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18)
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5165
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1926 24/07/1926 99 days General  
Gorton Works 31/07/1926 31/07/1926 1 day Light Repair
Converted to oil burnng
 
Nine Elms Works 02/03/1927 02/03/1927 1 day Unclassified
Oil burning equipment removed
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1928 09/02/1929 64 days General  
Gorton Works 28/02/1931 04/04/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 20/08/1932 24/09/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 343 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1934 17/03/1934 43 days General
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 28/03/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1937 20/11/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 02/03/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1941 06/12/1941 23 days Heavy
Special examination
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1943 29/05/1943 45 days Heavy
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1944 30/09/1944 99 days General
New frames & cylinders
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1946 03/08/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1947 05/04/1947 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/09/1947 18/10/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/01/1949 05/03/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69800
 
Darlington Works 01/05/1951 08/06/1951 39 days General
Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1954 12/06/1954 50 days General
Boiler number 22039 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1954 16/06/1954 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/09/1956 16/10/1956 34 days General
Boiler number 22397 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1957 29/04/1957 41 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 22/08/1959 22/08/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/03/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 165
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
02/06/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1917. Dep: 15/09/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18)
   
27/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1922. Dep: 05/08/1922.    
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
21/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18)
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5165
   
17/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 24/07/1926.    
31/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/07/1926. Dep: 31/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Converted to oil burnng
   
02/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Nine Elms Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1927. Dep: 02/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Oil burning equipment removed
   
08/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929.    
28/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 04/04/1931.    
20/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 343 (Diagram 18)
   
03/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
30/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18)
   
04/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
17/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18)
   
08/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
27/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
14/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/11/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Special examination
   
15/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
   
30/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
24/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
New frames & cylinders
   
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9800    
22/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18)
   
29/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947.    
27/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
   
29/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3848 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69800
   
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1951. Dep: 08/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18)
   
24/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22039 (Diagram 18)
   
10/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 16/06/1954.    
23/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
13/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1956. Dep: 16/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22397 (Diagram 18)
   
20/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1957. Dep: 29/04/1957.    
15/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
26/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
08/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (16D)    
15/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E)    
11/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
22/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 22/08/1959. Dep: 22/08/1959.    
24/08/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69800 from Colwick (40E)    
11/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev