Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 29 Online
» 509 Today
» 1251 Yesterday
» 4247 Week
» 1760 Month
» 229644 Year
» 1451209 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 167 on 06/05/1911
LNER (1924) 5167   11/10/1924
LNER (1946) 9802 on 24/03/1946
BR 69802   05/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Wed 06/05/1911 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Wed 24/12/1958 off Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)
Scrapping During 06/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 47 yrs, 7 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 06/05/1911
ARD Ardsley 20/11/1924
KX Kings Cross 15/02/1928
NEA Neasden 12/09/1928
51K Saltburn 04/06/1950
53B Hull Botanic Gardens 19/08/1951
53D Bridlington 09/01/1955
53B Hull Botanic Gardens 29/05/1955
   Withdrawn 24/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 51K Saltburn 04/06/1950
ALLOC 51K Saltburn m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 25/08/1951
ALLOC 53D Bridlington 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 18/06/1955
WDN   24/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/05/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1421)
19/08/1916 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1624)
04/02/1922 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 138)
11/10/1924 Side Window Cab Fitted
29/11/1930 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 983)
15/07/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 719)
25/07/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 799)
09/10/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 941)
22/04/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 392)
16/08/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3853)
14/10/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
14/09/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3866)
05/06/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3861)
10/12/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
09/02/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22382)
03/07/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22370)
01/03/1958 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22381)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/06/1916 19/08/1916 78 days General
Robinson superheater boiler
Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1921 04/02/1922 71 days General
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1922 02/09/1922 22 days Light Repair
New cylinders
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1924 11/10/1924 116 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5167
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1926 28/08/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 19/07/1927 21/01/1928 187 days General  
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 18/08/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 18/10/1930 29/11/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 983 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1932 09/07/1932 36 days General  
Gorton Works 17/06/1933 15/07/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1935 16/03/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1936 25/07/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 09/10/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1939 22/04/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1941 16/08/1941 39 days General
Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1942 02/01/1943 103 days General  
Gorton Works 30/08/1944 14/10/1944 46 days General
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1946 14/09/1946 127 days General
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 08/05/1948 05/06/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69802
 
Darlington Works 02/11/1949 10/12/1949 39 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1952 09/02/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 22382 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1954 03/07/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22370 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 14/06/1955 15/09/1955 94 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 30/01/1958 01/03/1958 31 days General
Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 03/03/1958 05/03/1958 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/12/1958 24/12/1958 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/05/1911 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 167
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
03/06/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1916. Dep: 19/08/1916.
Work undertaken:
Robinson superheater boiler
Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18)
   
26/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1921. Dep: 04/02/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 18)
   
12/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders
   
18/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1924. Dep: 11/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5167
   
20/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
05/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1926. Dep: 28/08/1926.    
19/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928.    
15/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 18/08/1928.    
12/09/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 983 (Diagram 18)
   
04/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932.    
17/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 15/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18)
   
16/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18)
   
27/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18)
   
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18)
   
25/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18)
   
09/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18)
   
22/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.    
30/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
   
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9802    
11/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 18)
   
08/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3861 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69802
   
02/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
19/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
03/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1952. Dep: 09/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22382 (Diagram 18)
   
22/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22370 (Diagram 18)
   
09/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bridlington (53D)    
29/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
14/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1955. Dep: 15/09/1955.    
30/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18)
   
03/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1958. Dep: 05/03/1958.    
24/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69802 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
24/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/12/1958. Dep: 24/12/1958.    

prev prev