|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/10/1916 | 23/12/1916 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1922 | 01/07/1922 | 92 days | General | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5168 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1926 | 25/12/1926 | 113 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1929 | 19/10/1929 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1934 | 19/05/1934 | 64 days | General | Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1936 | 30/05/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1937 | 21/08/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1942 | 05/09/1942 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1943 | 01/01/1944 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/01/1945 | 10/02/1945 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/09/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1946 | 07/12/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1948 | 06/03/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9803 |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/03/1949 | 29/04/1949 | 37 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 69803 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1951 | 14/07/1951 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 22375 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1953 | 04/09/1953 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1955 | 08/07/1955 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1955 | 20/07/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/10/1955 | 04/10/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1959 | 23/06/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/07/1958 | Nottingham - Lincoln | On 12th July, A5 69803 (40A) was noted on the 2-55 p.m. ex Lincoln and the return working (5.45 p.m. ex Derby). | SLS/195808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/05/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 168 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
28/10/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1916. Dep: 23/12/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1421 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/04/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
15/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5168 |
||
20/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
04/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1926. Dep: 25/12/1926. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted |
||
16/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. | ||
28/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
31/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929. | ||
09/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 392 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934. Work undertaken: Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
09/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
24/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1937. Dep: 21/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1943. Dep: 01/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18) |
||
06/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945. | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9803 | ||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. | ||
30/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/11/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946. | ||
07/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 06/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9803 |
||
11/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
17/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
24/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1949. Dep: 29/04/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69803 |
||
10/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
29/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
22/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1951. Dep: 14/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22375 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1953. Dep: 04/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1955. Dep: 20/07/1955. | ||
28/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 04/10/1955. | ||
24/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
13/04/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
23/06/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69803 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
23/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/06/1959. Dep: 23/06/1959. | ||
07/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |