Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 169   27/05/1911
LNER (1924) 169C   03/10/1923
LNER (1924) 5169   03/04/1926
LNER (1946) 9804   31/03/1946
BR 69804   03/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 27/05/1911 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 07/04/1958 off Colwick (38A)
Scrapping During 06/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 46 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 27/05/1911
WFD Woodford Halse 06/12/1939
NEA Neasden 30/12/1939
40A Lincoln 23/04/1950
40B Immingham 20/02/1955
40F Boston 24/04/1955
40E Langwith Junction 15/05/1955
38A Colwick 23/10/1955
   Withdrawn 07/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 05/11/1955
WDN   07/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/05/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1423)
12/06/1920 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1530)
04/03/1922 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
03/04/1926 Side Window Cab Fitted
24/12/1927 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1532)
14/05/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1843)
16/09/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1597)
28/09/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 444)
28/09/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
14/08/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 410)
01/03/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 168)
06/01/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3853)
26/10/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 964)
03/04/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3869)
05/01/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 806)
22/01/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22387)
05/02/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22391)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/04/1920 12/06/1920 57 days General
Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1922 04/03/1922 57 days General
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1923 13/10/1923 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 169C
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1923 17/11/1923 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1926 03/04/1926 71 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5169
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 24/12/1927 64 days General
Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1929 08/02/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 16/04/1932 14/05/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1933 16/09/1933 43 days General
Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1935 28/09/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1937 14/08/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1939 25/02/1939 36 days General  
Gorton Works 08/02/1941 01/03/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1942 13/02/1943 96 days General  
Gorton Works 25/11/1944 06/01/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1946 26/10/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1948 03/04/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69804
 
Darlington Works 11/12/1948 08/01/1949 29 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 05/11/1949 05/01/1950 62 days General
Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 10/12/1951 22/01/1952 44 days General
Boiler number 22387 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1954 05/02/1955 57 days General
Boiler number 22391 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 03/01/1956 02/02/1956 31 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 27/08/1957 11/10/1957 46 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 31/03/1958 31/03/1958 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/05/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 169
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
17/04/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1920. Dep: 12/06/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1530 (Diagram 18)
   
07/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1922. Dep: 04/03/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
28/07/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1923. Dep: 13/10/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 169C
   
10/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1923. Dep: 17/11/1923.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
23/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5169
   
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18)
   
21/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 08/02/1930.    
16/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1932. Dep: 14/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18)
   
05/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18)
   
24/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 28/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 444 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
10/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18)
   
21/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.    
06/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
30/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
08/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
   
10/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943.    
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18)
   
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9804    
21/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
   
28/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1948. Dep: 03/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69804
   
11/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/12/1948. Dep: 08/01/1949.    
05/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1949. Dep: 05/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18)
   
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
10/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1951. Dep: 22/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22387 (Diagram 18)
   
11/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1954. Dep: 05/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22391 (Diagram 18)
   
20/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
24/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
15/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
23/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
03/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 02/02/1956.    
27/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/08/1957. Dep: 11/10/1957.    
31/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 31/03/1958.    
07/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69804 from Colwick (38A)    
06/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev