Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 170   10/06/1911
LNER (1924) 5170   07/06/1924
LNER (1946) 9805   31/03/1946
BR 69805   05/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Wed 10/06/1911 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Wed 23/09/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 10/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 48 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) 10/06/1911
ARD Ardsley 05/01/1924
GOR Gorton 25/03/1924
NEA Neasden 07/07/1924
CLK Colwick 29/01/1950
34E Neasden 30/07/1950
39A Gorton 13/06/1954
38A Colwick 19/05/1957
   Withdrawn 23/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 34E Neasden w/e 30/07/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 15/06/1957
WDN   23/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/06/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1424)
09/11/1918 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1533)
07/06/1924 Side Window Cab Fitted
21/08/1926 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 253)
06/12/1930 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
29/09/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 844)
11/04/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 816)
11/04/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
24/07/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 366)
20/05/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 941)
12/07/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3852)
25/08/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3858)
31/05/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 171)
05/02/1949 WPU Gear removed
05/02/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 708)
01/06/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22369)
30/07/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22046)
30/05/1958 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22041)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/08/1918 09/11/1918 71 days General
Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1922 04/11/1922 50 days General  
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 07/06/1924 71 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5170
 
Gorton Works 29/05/1926 21/08/1926 85 days General
Boiler number 253 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1928 22/09/1928 64 days General  
Gorton Works 01/11/1930 06/12/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1932 03/12/1932 36 days General  
Gorton Works 25/08/1934 29/09/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1936 11/04/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 816 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1937 24/07/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 366 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1939 20/05/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1941 12/07/1941 50 days General
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1943 25/09/1943 123 days General  
Gorton Works 07/07/1945 25/08/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1947 31/05/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1948 05/02/1949 37 days General
Boiler number 708 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69805
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1949 27/08/1949 25 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 26/04/1951 01/06/1951 37 days General
Boiler number 22369 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 05/12/1952 21/03/1953 107 days General  
Darlington Works 23/03/1953 24/03/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/03/1953 17/04/1953 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/06/1955 30/07/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 22046 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1958 30/05/1958 38 days General
Boiler number 22041 (Diagram 18)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/06/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 170
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
31/08/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1918. Dep: 09/11/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18)
   
16/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1922. Dep: 04/11/1922.    
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
25/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5170
   
07/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
29/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1926. Dep: 21/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 253 (Diagram 18)
   
21/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928.    
01/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1930. Dep: 06/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
   
29/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932.    
25/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18)
   
21/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 816 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
26/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 366 (Diagram 18)
   
29/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18)
   
24/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18)
   
26/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943.    
07/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18)
   
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9805    
26/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18)
   
31/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 05/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 708 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69805
   
03/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1949. Dep: 27/08/1949.    
29/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
26/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1951. Dep: 01/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22369 (Diagram 18)
   
05/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1952. Dep: 21/03/1953.    
23/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 24/03/1953.    
30/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 17/04/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
29/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22046 (Diagram 18)
   
19/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
23/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1958. Dep: 30/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22041 (Diagram 18)
   
23/09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69805 from Colwick (40E)    
10/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev