Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 447   15/07/1911
LNER (1924) 5447   28/03/1925

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 15/07/1911 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 21/12/1942 off Neasden (NEA)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 31 yrs, 5 mths , 6 dys
Information Withdrawn with badly cracked frames

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 15/07/1911
   Withdrawn 21/12/1942

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/07/1911 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1427)
13/10/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1425)
28/03/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1685)
28/03/1925 Side Window Cab Fitted
09/01/1932 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 384)
16/12/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 321)
21/09/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
10/04/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 985)
14/01/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 800)
26/10/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3842)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 23/06/1917 13/10/1917 113 days General
Boiler number 1425 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 1919 10/10/1919   Light Repair
Reliostop fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1923 10/03/1923 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/01/1925 28/03/1925 71 days General
Boiler number 1685 (Diagram 18)
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5447
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1927 16/07/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 19/10/1929 07/12/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 28/11/1931 09/01/1932 43 days General
Boiler number 384 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1933 16/12/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 321 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 21/09/1935 50 days General
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1937 10/04/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 985 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1938 14/01/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1940 26/10/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3842 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1942 21/12/1942 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/07/1911 To Service To service as GCR Number 447
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
23/06/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1917. Dep: 13/10/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1425 (Diagram 18)
   
1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: 10/10/1919.
Work undertaken:
Reliostop fitted
   
13/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1923. Dep: 10/03/1923.    
17/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1685 (Diagram 18)
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5447
   
21/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927.    
19/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.    
28/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1931. Dep: 09/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 384 (Diagram 18)
   
11/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 321 (Diagram 18)
   
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
13/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 10/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 985 (Diagram 18)
   
17/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 14/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18)
   
05/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3842 (Diagram 18)
   
21/12/1942 Withdrawn Condemned as 5447 from Neasden (NEA)    
21/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 21/12/1942. Dep: 21/12/1942.    

prev prev