|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/11/1917 | 02/02/1918 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1427 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1921 | 29/10/1921 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1922 | 05/01/1922 | 1 day | Light Repair | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 03/03/1923 | 09/06/1923 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1683 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1925 | 13/02/1926 | 78 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5448 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1927 | 11/02/1928 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1929 | 04/01/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1784 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1933 | 13/01/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 416 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1935 | 03/08/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1936 | 23/01/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1938 | 12/03/1938 | 36 days | General | Trip cock gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1941 | 06/12/1941 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 31 days | Light Repair | Collision damage |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 696 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1944 | 21/10/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 658 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9808 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1947 | 17/01/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9808 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1949 | 06/12/1949 | 168 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69808 |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 22388 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1952 | 26/03/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1954 | 26/06/1954 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1954 | 05/07/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1956 | 02/10/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1960 | 17/11/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/04/1959 | Branch Lines | The following have been approved for closure by the T.U.C.C. and it is expected that some of the passenger services thereon will lapse with the end of Winter t.t.- Kettering to Cambridge (as far as St. Ives), Penistone-Barnsley-Mexborough, South-well branch, Stamford-Essendine, Wallingford branch and Wellingborough-Higham Ferrers; in connection with the Barnsley (C.H.) branch, note that the 1-25 a.m. Manchester (L. Rd.)-Doncaster is still to travel this way calling at Barnsley. The T.U.C.C. have not approved the closure of the Grimsby and Immingham Ty. or the local stations between Sheffield and Penistone; C.I.E. is to close the former G.N.R. (I) Hill of Howth Ty. as from 1st June. In connection with the quotations which the Press made from the N.U.R. Review of the list of branches 'under consideration' on the L.M.R., it should be noted that the operative word is 'consideration.' Any concrete proposals have to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. concerned, together with the alternative facilities arranged. It is understood that the Churnet Valley, Northampton-Bedford and Bedford-Hitchin branches are to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. for closure together with the local stations between Northampton and Rugby and Roade station. On the W.R., it is understood that it is proposed to withdraw the passenger services from Hartlebury and Kidderminster to Bridgnorth and between Bewdley and Woofferton if the B.T.C. Parliamentary bill is approved. During the early part of May A5 69808 worked the Southwell branch whilst 58065 was under repair. During May, the Penistone-Barnsley branch was worked by J11s or 67445 (C14); the other C14 (67448) was out of use at Mexborough shed. It is expected that this will be the last sununer that it will be possible to travel by passenger train between Tebay or Penrith and Barnard Castle (goods traffic has already been diverted); the last summer too that it will be possible to travel by steam train on the Oban and Fort William branches. Locomotive Information H.R. 103 is at present in St. Rollox Works undergoing heavy repair. N.B.R. Glen Douglas is in Cowlairs Works being ' restored ' and work on the M.R. Compound proceeds at Derby-on 22nd May the number 1000 was affixed to the smokebox (see Derby Works list). |
SLS/195906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/08/1911 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 448 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
17/11/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1917. Dep: 02/02/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1427 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/09/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 29/10/1921. | ||
05/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1922. Dep: 05/01/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
03/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1923. Dep: 09/06/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1683 (Diagram 18) |
||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
28/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5448 |
||
26/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1927. Dep: 11/02/1928. | ||
22/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
16/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 04/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1784 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1624 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 13/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 416 (Diagram 18) |
||
06/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1935. Dep: 03/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
26/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18) |
||
05/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938. Work undertaken: Trip cock gear fitted |
||
28/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
16/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. Work undertaken: Collision damage |
||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
28/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 696 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944. | ||
13/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 658 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9808 |
||
13/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1947. Dep: 17/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9808 |
||
22/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1949. Dep: 06/12/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69808 |
||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
06/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22388 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 26/03/1952. | ||
15/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954. | ||
27/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/06/1954. Dep: 05/07/1954. | ||
19/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
26/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
24/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1956. Dep: 02/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
11/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
17/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69808 from Lincoln (40A) | ||
17/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/11/1960. Dep: 17/11/1960. |