|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 15/11/1919 | 27/12/1919 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1921 | 03/09/1921 | 71 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1921 | 20/10/1921 | 1 day | Light Repair | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1923 | 02/06/1923 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 69 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5450 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1927 | 29/01/1927 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1927 | 09/07/1927 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1929 | 06/07/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1931 | 10/10/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1933 | 17/06/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 985 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 653 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1938 | 08/10/1938 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 384 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1938 | 17/12/1938 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1943 | 05/06/1943 | 52 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 36 days | General | New frames & cylinders Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3845 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1948 | 11/12/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 783 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69810 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/03/1951 | 14/03/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1951 | 21/09/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22379 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1952 | 14/06/1952 | 19 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1953 | 19/05/1953 | 51 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1953 | 26/09/1953 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22357 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1954 | 08/04/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1954 | 05/03/1955 | 99 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1955 | 15/03/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1956 | 05/12/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22039 (Diagram 18) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/05/1959 | Darlington area | The withdrawn engines at Fighting Cocks and on the Barnard Castle branch were still there on 4th May, except that the Broomielaw ones were observed in the scrap yard at Darlington. North Road station contained 62754, 69810/34/42/63/4. Sentinel 68150 (50C) arrived for scrap 6th May (last in Capital stock). | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/11/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 450 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1919. Dep: 27/12/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1921. Dep: 03/09/1921. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted |
||
20/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1921. Dep: 20/10/1921. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
24/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 02/06/1923. | ||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
24/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5450 |
||
05/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
24/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/01/1927. Dep: 29/01/1927. | ||
14/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1927. Dep: 09/07/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
11/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1929. Dep: 06/07/1929. | ||
29/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 985 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 653 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 384 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938. | ||
06/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
30/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1943. Dep: 05/06/1943. | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. Work undertaken: New frames & cylinders Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9810 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3845 (Diagram 18) |
||
06/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1948. Dep: 11/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 783 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69810 |
||
30/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
11/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
04/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 14/03/1951. Dep: 14/03/1951. | ||
08/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
14/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
28/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
22/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1951. Dep: 21/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22379 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 14/06/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/03/1953. Dep: 19/05/1953. | ||
04/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1953. Dep: 26/09/1953. | ||
29/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. | ||
13/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 13/03/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22357 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1954. Dep: 08/04/1954. | ||
27/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/11/1954. Dep: 05/03/1955. | ||
08/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 15/03/1955. | ||
31/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1956. Dep: 05/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22039 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69810 from Colwick (40E) | ||
05/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |