Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 189 Week
» 18971 Month
» 267264 Year
» 1151645 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 128   21/12/1912
LNER (1924) 5128   28/06/1924
LNER (1946) 9813   22/06/1946
BR (Tmp) E9813   28/02/1948
BR 69813   14/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Tue 21/12/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Tue 01/03/1960 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 05/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 47 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) 21/12/1912
NEA Neasden 07/07/1924
ARD Ardsley 20/11/1924
NEA Neasden 01/10/1928
40A Lincoln 23/04/1950
40B Immingham 26/09/1954
40A Lincoln 02/01/1955
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 19/02/1956
40B Immingham 26/02/1956
40A Lincoln 02/12/1956
39A Gorton 16/12/1956
   Withdrawn 01/03/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 29/12/1956
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 05/03/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/12/1912 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1533)
06/07/1918 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1532)
09/05/1922 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
28/06/1924 Side Window Cab Fitted
17/07/1926 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 719)
06/05/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 800)
08/12/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
08/12/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 986)
17/10/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
17/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
02/04/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 964)
11/05/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 720)
24/10/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
15/08/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3849)
22/06/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3851)
28/02/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 844)
26/01/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 171)
11/10/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22361)
05/08/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22393)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/05/1918 06/07/1918 57 days General
Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1922 11/03/1922 50 days General  
Gorton Works 09/05/1922 09/05/1922 1 day Light Repair
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1924 28/06/1924 92 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5128
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1926 17/07/1926 127 days General
Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1928 29/09/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 13/12/1930 24/01/1931 43 days General  
Gorton Works 08/04/1933 06/05/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1934 08/12/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1936 17/10/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1938 02/04/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1940 11/05/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1942 24/10/1942 54 days General
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1944 15/08/1944 46 days General
Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 22/06/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3851 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9813
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1946 24/08/1946 8 days Light Repair
Afer collision
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1948 28/02/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9813
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1948 14/08/1948 15 days Heavy Casual
Renumbered to BR 69813
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1949 26/01/1950 50 days General
Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 05/09/1952 11/10/1952 37 days General
Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 23/06/1955 05/08/1955 44 days General
Boiler number 22393 (Diagram 18)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 128
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
11/05/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1918. Dep: 06/07/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18)
   
21/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1922. Dep: 11/03/1922.    
09/05/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1922. Dep: 09/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
29/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5128
   
07/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
20/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
13/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18)
   
04/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928.    
01/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
13/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1930. Dep: 24/01/1931.    
08/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18)
   
17/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
26/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
12/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
   
13/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
   
01/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
   
01/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 15/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18)
   
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3851 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9813
   
17/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Afer collision
   
17/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9813
   
31/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1948. Dep: 14/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 69813
   
08/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1949. Dep: 26/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18)
   
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
05/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18)
   
26/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
23/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22393 (Diagram 18)
   
19/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
26/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
02/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
16/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
01/03/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69813 from Gorton (9G)    
05/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev