|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/05/1918 | 06/07/1918 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1922 | 11/03/1922 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1922 | 09/05/1922 | 1 day | Light Repair | Ross Pop |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1924 | 28/06/1924 | 92 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5128 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1926 | 17/07/1926 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1928 | 29/09/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1930 | 24/01/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/04/1933 | 06/05/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1934 | 08/12/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1938 | 02/04/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1944 | 15/08/1944 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1946 | 22/06/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3851 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9813 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | Afer collision |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1948 | 28/02/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9813 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1948 | 14/08/1948 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | Renumbered to BR 69813 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1949 | 26/01/1950 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1952 | 11/10/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1955 | 05/08/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 22393 (Diagram 18) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/12/1912 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 128 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Annesley (ANN) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
11/05/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1918. Dep: 06/07/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/01/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1922. Dep: 11/03/1922. | ||
09/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1922. Dep: 09/05/1922. Work undertaken: Ross Pop |
||
29/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5128 |
||
07/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
20/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
13/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 719 (Diagram 18) |
||
04/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1928. Dep: 29/09/1928. | ||
01/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
13/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1930. Dep: 24/01/1931. | ||
08/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 986 (Diagram 18) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
26/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
12/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 15/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3849 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3851 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9813 |
||
17/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Afer collision |
||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9813 |
||
31/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1948. Dep: 14/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69813 |
||
08/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1949. Dep: 26/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 171 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
05/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1952. Dep: 11/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18) |
||
26/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
02/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
23/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1955. Dep: 05/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22393 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
26/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
02/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
16/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
01/03/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69813 from Gorton (9G) | ||
05/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |