Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 414 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 4235 Week
» 21571 Month
» 299367 Year
» 1183748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 129   28/12/1912
LNER (1924) 5129   16/02/1924
LNER (1946) 9814   11/08/1946
BR 69814   24/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 28/12/1912 to Annesley (ANN)
Withdrawal Mon 14/11/1960 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 11/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 47 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley (New) 28/12/1912
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 25/03/1924
NEA Neasden 21/04/1924
ARD Ardsley 20/11/1924
KX Kings Cross 07/05/1928
NEA Neasden 18/11/1929
CLK Colwick 30/12/1949
34E Neasden 29/04/1951
35B Grantham 16/05/1954
34A Kings Cross 27/12/1959
40A Lincoln 12/06/1960
40E Colwick 19/06/1960
   Withdrawn 14/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 34E Neasden w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick 3w/e 02/07/1960
WDN   14/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/12/1912 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1534)
28/02/1920 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1843)
28/01/1922 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
16/02/1924 Side Window Cab Fitted
28/04/1928 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1533)
14/11/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 395)
24/03/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
24/03/1934 Eureka lubricator fitted
07/12/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 939)
07/12/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
02/10/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 816)
01/04/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1597)
24/05/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 772)
09/06/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 156)
18/01/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3859)
24/07/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3854)
06/09/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22350)
26/09/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22351)
11/03/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22360)
21/03/1958 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22383)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/02/1920 28/02/1920 22 days General
Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1921 28/01/1922 85 days General
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1923 16/02/1924 106 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5129
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1925 13/02/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 11/02/1928 28/04/1928 78 days General
Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 09/11/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 03/10/1931 14/11/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 03/02/1934 24/03/1934 50 days General
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1935 07/12/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 939 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 04/07/1936 22 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 28/08/1937 02/10/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 816 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1939 01/04/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1941 24/05/1941 36 days General
Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1943 11/09/1943 53 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1945 09/06/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1946 18/01/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1948 24/07/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69814
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1948 18/09/1948 11 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 01/08/1950 06/09/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 22350 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 12/09/1950 14/09/1950 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/08/1951 05/09/1951 29 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 20/08/1952 26/09/1952 38 days General
Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 01/10/1952 07/10/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 09/02/1955 11/03/1955 31 days General
Boiler number 22360 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 13/09/1955 17/09/1955 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/02/1958 21/03/1958 32 days General
Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/12/1912 To Service To service as GCR Number 129
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Annesley (ANN)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
07/02/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1920. Dep: 28/02/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18)
   
05/11/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1921. Dep: 28/01/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
03/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1923. Dep: 16/02/1924.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5129
   
25/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
20/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
28/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1925. Dep: 13/02/1926.    
11/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1928. Dep: 28/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18)
   
07/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
28/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929.    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
   
03/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
16/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 939 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
13/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.    
28/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 816 (Diagram 18)
   
04/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1597 (Diagram 18)
   
19/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 24/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18)
   
21/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943.    
28/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18)
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9814    
14/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 18/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3859 (Diagram 18)
   
12/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 24/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69814
   
08/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/09/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948.    
30/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1950. Dep: 06/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22350 (Diagram 18)
   
12/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1950. Dep: 14/09/1950.    
29/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
08/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1951. Dep: 05/09/1951.    
20/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18)
   
01/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/10/1952. Dep: 07/10/1952.    
16/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
09/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1955. Dep: 11/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22360 (Diagram 18)
   
13/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955.    
18/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18)
   
27/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
12/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
19/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
11/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
14/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69814 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev