|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/07/1922 | 23/09/1922 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 343 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1924 | 27/12/1924 | 57 days | General | Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5371 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1926 | 19/02/1927 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1929 | 23/11/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1930 | 06/09/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1932 | 11/06/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1638 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1936 | 23/05/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 957 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1939 | 18/03/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 118 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 108 days | General | Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 968 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9815 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1948 | 31/07/1948 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69815 |
||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1950 | 09/09/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22392 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1953 | 23/09/1953 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1954 | 28/01/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22043 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1957 | 25/06/1957 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1917 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 371 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
08/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 343 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924. Work undertaken: Side Window Cab Fitted Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5371 |
||
05/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
27/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1926. Dep: 19/02/1927. | ||
20/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
28/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. | ||
26/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 06/09/1930. | ||
21/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1638 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 957 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
21/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. | ||
08/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 118 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 968 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9815 |
||
05/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 31/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69815 |
||
06/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
08/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
16/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
22/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 09/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22351 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22392 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1953. Dep: 23/09/1953. | ||
07/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
21/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1954. Dep: 28/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22043 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
25/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 25/06/1957. Dep: 25/06/1957. | ||
07/1957 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
15/07/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69815 from Gorton (39A) |