Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 43 Today
» 1000 Yesterday
» 1968 Week
» 19304 Month
» 297100 Year
» 1181481 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 373   25/08/1917
LNER (1924) 5373   31/05/1924
LNER (1946) 9817   04/05/1946
BR 69817 w/e 04/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 25/08/1917 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 04/04/1960 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 04/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 42 yrs, 7 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 25/08/1917
GOR Gorton 20/12/1927
NEA Neasden 30/06/1928
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 10/07/1937
NEA Neasden 28/10/1937
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 19/05/1938
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 29/07/1938
NEA Neasden 24/11/1938
KX Kings Cross 20/09/1939
CLK Colwick 25/05/1940
NEA Neasden 07/11/1940
ARD Ardsley 05/09/1941
NEA Neasden 15/02/1943
GRA Grantham 09/05/1948
BOS Boston 23/01/1949
CLK Colwick 11/12/1949
39A Gorton 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn 04/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GRA Grantham w/e 15/05/1948
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 19/06/1954
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 09/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/08/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1685)
31/05/1924 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 185)
27/03/1926 Side Window Cab Fitted
22/03/1927 Oil burning equipment removed
30/08/1930 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1683)
09/06/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 843)
14/12/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 941)
14/12/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
10/07/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 713)
02/09/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 396)
30/05/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3850)
20/05/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 558)
04/05/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 844)
10/01/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 149)
04/11/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22356)
10/01/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22395)
06/05/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22387)
13/02/1958 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22390)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/01/1922 01/04/1922 70 days General  
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 31/05/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5373
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1926 27/03/1926 78 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
 
Nine Elms Works 09/08/1926 18/08/1926 10 days Light Repair
Converted to fuel 0il
 
Nine Elms Works 22/03/1927 22/03/1927 1 day Light Repair
Oil burning equipment removed
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1928 16/06/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 26/07/1930 30/08/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 1683 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1932 07/05/1932 36 days General  
Gorton Works 28/04/1934 09/06/1934 43 days General
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1935 14/12/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1937 10/07/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1939 02/09/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
 
Doncaster Works 12/08/1941 05/09/1941 25 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/04/1942 30/05/1942 32 days General
Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1944 20/05/1944 43 days General
Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1946 04/05/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9817
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1947 10/01/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 149 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 25/09/1950 04/11/1950 41 days General
Boiler number 22356 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69817
 
Gateshead Works 26/08/1952 26/09/1952 32 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 21/11/1952 10/01/1953 51 days General
Boiler number 22395 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 29/03/1955 06/05/1955 39 days General
Boiler number 22387 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 11/01/1958 13/02/1958 34 days General
Boiler number 22390 (Diagram 18)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/08/1917 To Service To service as GCR Number 373
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
22/01/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1922. Dep: 01/04/1922.    
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 185 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5373
   
09/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1926. Dep: 27/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
   
09/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Nine Elms Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1926. Dep: 18/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Converted to fuel 0il
   
22/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Nine Elms Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1927. Dep: 22/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Oil burning equipment removed
   
20/12/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 16/06/1928.    
30/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
26/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1683 (Diagram 18)
   
02/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 07/05/1932.    
28/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
   
16/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 941 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
12/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18)
   
10/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
28/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
19/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
29/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
24/11/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
05/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
   
20/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
25/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/11/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
12/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 05/09/1941.    
05/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
29/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1942. Dep: 30/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18)
   
15/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
08/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18)
   
06/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 844 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9817
   
29/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 10/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 149 (Diagram 18)
   
09/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
23/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
11/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
25/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22356 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69817
   
26/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952.    
21/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22395 (Diagram 18)
   
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
29/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22387 (Diagram 18)
   
11/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1958. Dep: 13/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22390 (Diagram 18)
   
04/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
04/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69817 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev