Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 108 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2969 Week
» 20305 Month
» 298101 Year
» 1182482 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 374   29/09/1917
LNER (1924) 5374   27/12/1924
LNER (1946) 9818   11/08/1946
BR 69818   16/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Tue 29/09/1917 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Tue 16/12/1958 off Annesley (16D)
Scrapping During 02/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 41 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 29/09/1917
ARD Ardsley 08/01/1925
NEA Neasden 15/09/1927
? London Transport Passenger Board 01/11/1937
NEA Neasden 17/04/1938
BOS Boston 07/01/1949
LNG Langwith Junction 16/01/1949
51A Darlington 28/01/1951
38A Colwick 01/07/1951
38B Annesley 21/10/1956
   Withdrawn 16/12/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC LNG Langwith Junction w/e 22/01/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 10/11/1956
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 20/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/09/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1686)
14/10/1922 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 366)
27/12/1924 Side Window Cab Fitted
28/02/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 156)
06/05/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 799)
20/10/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 984)
20/10/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
26/09/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
26/09/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 696)
30/10/1937 Trip cock gear fitted
08/07/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1825)
05/10/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 291)
24/07/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 718)
22/09/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3852)
29/03/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 783)
16/10/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 936)
16/10/1948 WPU Gear removed
27/01/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22362)
19/06/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22397)
25/04/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22045)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/07/1922 14/10/1922 99 days General
Boiler number 366 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1924 27/12/1924 57 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5374
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 28/05/1927 64 days General  
Gorton Works 01/06/1929 06/07/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/01/1931 28/02/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1933 06/05/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1934 20/10/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 26/09/1936 36 days General
Boiler number 696 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1937 23/10/1937 36 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 30/10/1937 30/10/1937 1 day Light Repair
Trip cock gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1939 08/07/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1940 05/10/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 291 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1943 24/07/1943 40 days General
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1945 22/09/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1946 28/09/1946 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/03/1947 29/03/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 783 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1948 16/10/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 936 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69818
 
Darlington Works 19/12/1950 27/01/1951 40 days General
Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 06/02/1951 07/02/1951 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 30/07/1952 02/08/1952 4 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 18/05/1953 19/06/1953 33 days General
Boiler number 22397 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 16/03/1956 25/04/1956 41 days General
Boiler number 22045 (Diagram 18)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/09/1917 To Service To service as GCR Number 374
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
08/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1922. Dep: 14/10/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 366 (Diagram 18)
   
01/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1924. Dep: 27/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5374
   
08/01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 28/05/1927.    
15/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
01/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1929. Dep: 06/07/1929.    
24/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18)
   
08/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18)
   
29/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 696 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
18/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937.    
30/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Trip cock gear fitted
   
01/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to London Transport Passenger Board (?)    
17/04/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
10/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1825 (Diagram 18)
   
14/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1940. Dep: 05/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 291 (Diagram 18)
   
15/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 718 (Diagram 18)
   
04/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18)
   
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9818    
28/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946.    
01/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 29/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 783 (Diagram 18)
   
11/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 936 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69818
   
07/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
16/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
19/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1950. Dep: 27/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18)
   
28/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
06/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1951. Dep: 07/02/1951.    
01/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1952. Dep: 02/08/1952.    
18/05/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1953. Dep: 19/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22397 (Diagram 18)
   
16/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1956. Dep: 25/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22045 (Diagram 18)
   
21/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
16/12/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69818 from Annesley (16D)    
02/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev