Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 730 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3873 Week
» 14043 Month
» 291839 Year
» 1176220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 411   27/10/1917
LNER (1924) 5411   21/02/1925
LNER (1946) 9819   04/05/1946
BR 69819   02/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 27/10/1917 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 03/03/1958 off Lincoln (40A)
Scrapping During 04/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 27/10/1917
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 20/05/1937
NEA Neasden 12/11/1937
? London Transport Passenger Board 14/11/1937
NEA Neasden 17/04/1938
ARD Ardsley 27/10/1941
NEA Neasden 15/02/1943
40B Immingham 26/03/1950
40F Boston 06/08/1950
40A Lincoln 16/12/1956
   Withdrawn 03/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 29/12/1956
WDN   03/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/10/1917 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1694)
25/11/1922 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 383)
21/02/1925 Side Window Cab Fitted
27/10/1928 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1534)
14/10/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1843)
22/02/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
22/02/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 395)
22/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
22/05/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 396)
25/11/1937 Trip cock gear fitted
22/07/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 808)
13/12/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 558)
22/04/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3854)
04/05/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 720)
20/12/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3868)
02/09/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 672)
08/12/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22384)
01/05/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22381)
06/07/1957 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22041)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/10/1922 03/02/1923 106 days General
Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1924 21/02/1925 92 days General
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5411
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1926 15/01/1927 92 days General  
Gorton Works 15/09/1928 27/10/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1534 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1930 14/02/1931 46 days General  
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 14/10/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1936 22/02/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1937 22/05/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
 
Doncaster Works 22/11/1937 25/11/1937 4 days Light Repair
Trip cock gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1939 22/07/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1941 13/12/1941 43 days General
Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1944 22/04/1944 51 days General
Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 30/03/1946 04/05/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9819
 
Gorton Works 29/11/1947 20/12/1947 22 days General
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 3868 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 03/08/1949 02/09/1949 31 days General
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69819
 
Darlington Works 12/11/1951 08/12/1951 27 days General
Boiler number 22384 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1954 01/05/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1957 06/07/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 22041 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 14/07/1957 19/07/1957 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/07/1957 28/07/1957 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/02/1958 05/02/1958 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/10/1917 To Service To service as GCR Number 411
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
21/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1922. Dep: 03/02/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18)
   
22/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 21/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Side Window Cab Fitted
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5411
   
16/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927.    
15/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1928. Dep: 27/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1534 (Diagram 18)
   
31/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1930. Dep: 14/02/1931.    
16/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1843 (Diagram 18)
   
25/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
17/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1937. Dep: 22/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
   
20/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
12/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
14/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to London Transport Passenger Board (?)    
22/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/11/1937. Dep: 25/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Trip cock gear fitted
   
17/04/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
24/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18)
   
27/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
01/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 558 (Diagram 18)
   
15/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18)
   
30/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 720 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9819
   
29/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 20/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 3868 (Diagram 18)
   
03/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69819
   
26/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (40F)    
12/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22384 (Diagram 18)
   
20/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22381 (Diagram 18)
   
16/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22041 (Diagram 18)
   
14/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/07/1957. Dep: 19/07/1957.    
24/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/07/1957. Dep: 28/07/1957.    
05/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/02/1958. Dep: 05/02/1958.    
03/03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69819 from Lincoln (40A)    
04/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev