Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 3   27/01/1923
LNER (1924) 5003   18/10/1924
LNER (1946) 9820   21/07/1946
BR 69820   09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 27/01/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 14/11/1960 off Immingham (40B)
Scrapping During 11/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 37 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 27/01/1923
? London Transport Passenger Board 16/01/1938
NEA Neasden 02/10/1938
40A Lincoln 23/04/1950
40B Immingham 10/02/1952
40A Lincoln 02/12/1956
40B Immingham 10/07/1960
   Withdrawn 14/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 29/12/1956
ALLOC 40B Immingham 5w/e 06/08/1960
WDN   17/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
27/01/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 384)
19/05/1928 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 843)
14/04/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 557)
28/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
28/03/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 808)
27/11/1937 Trip cock gear fitted
27/11/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 386)
21/10/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 325)
21/02/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 808)
15/01/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 843)
02/03/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 91)
25/10/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3858)
09/10/1948 WPU Gear removed
11/07/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 799)
06/07/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22376)
10/04/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22364)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 31/03/1923 14/04/1923 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 26/07/1924 18/10/1924 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5003
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1926 02/10/1926 95 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1928 19/05/1928 64 days General
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1929 04/01/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 31/12/1931 06/02/1932 38 days General  
Gorton Works 17/03/1934 14/04/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 28/03/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1937 27/11/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18)
Trip cock gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1939 21/10/1939 29 days General
Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1942 21/02/1942 30 days General
Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1943 15/01/1944 32 days General
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1944 16/12/1944 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 02/02/1946 02/03/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1947 25/10/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1948 09/10/1948 22 days Light Repair
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69820
 
Darlington Works 26/05/1949 11/07/1949 47 days General
Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 28/05/1951 06/07/1951 40 days General
Boiler number 22376 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1954 10/04/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22364 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 11/04/1954 16/04/1954 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 31/07/1954 28/08/1954 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/08/1954 03/09/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/03/1958 17/04/1958 45 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
27/01/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 3
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
31/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/03/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
26/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5003
   
30/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1926. Dep: 02/10/1926.    
17/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
   
16/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 04/01/1930.    
31/12/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1931. Dep: 06/02/1932.    
17/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18)
   
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
06/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18)
Trip cock gear fitted
   
16/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to London Transport Passenger Board (?)    
02/10/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18)
   
23/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18)
   
15/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18)
   
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944.    
02/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18)
   
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9820    
27/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18)
   
18/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69820
   
26/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1949. Dep: 11/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18)
   
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
28/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22376 (Diagram 18)
   
10/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
27/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22364 (Diagram 18)
   
11/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1954. Dep: 16/04/1954.    
31/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954.    
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
31/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 03/09/1954.    
02/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
04/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1958. Dep: 17/04/1958.    
10/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
11/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
14/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69820 from Immingham (40B)    

prev prev