|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 31/03/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 15 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1924 | 18/10/1924 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5003 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1926 | 02/10/1926 | 95 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1928 | 19/05/1928 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1929 | 04/01/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1931 | 06/02/1932 | 38 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 28/03/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1937 | 27/11/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18) Trip cock gear fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1939 | 21/10/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1942 | 21/02/1942 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1946 | 02/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1947 | 25/10/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1948 | 09/10/1948 | 22 days | Light Repair | WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69820 |
||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1949 | 11/07/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/05/1951 | 06/07/1951 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22376 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22364 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/04/1954 | 16/04/1954 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1954 | 03/09/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1958 | 17/04/1958 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/01/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
31/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/03/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
26/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1924. Dep: 18/10/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5003 |
||
30/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1926. Dep: 02/10/1926. | ||
17/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1929. Dep: 04/01/1930. | ||
31/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1931. Dep: 06/02/1932. | ||
17/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 557 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
06/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18) Trip cock gear fitted |
||
16/01/1938 | Allocation | |||
02/10/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
23/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 325 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1942. Dep: 21/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 808 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 843 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. | ||
02/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 91 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9820 | ||
27/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3858 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948. Work undertaken: WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69820 |
||
26/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1949. Dep: 11/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 799 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
28/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22376 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
27/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22364 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1954. Dep: 16/04/1954. | ||
31/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. | ||
31/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 03/09/1954. | ||
02/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
04/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1958. Dep: 17/04/1958. | ||
10/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
11/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
14/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69820 from Immingham (40B) |