Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 7   24/02/1923
LNER (1924) 5007   28/03/1925
LNER (1946) 9822   21/07/1946
BR 69822   14/07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 24/02/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 03/11/1958 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 11/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 24/02/1923
KX Kings Cross 05/12/1929
HIT Hither Green 29/11/1935
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 07/05/1937
NEA Neasden 27/11/1937
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 19/05/1938
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 29/07/1938
KX Kings Cross 26/02/1939
CLK Colwick 25/05/1940
NEA Neasden 27/06/1940
38A Colwick 05/03/1950
34E Neasden 30/07/1950
38A Colwick 07/12/1952
39A Gorton 17/02/1957
   Withdrawn 03/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 34E Neasden w/e 30/07/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 23/02/1957
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 08/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/02/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 390)
25/08/1928 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 391)
07/12/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 411)
28/11/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1533)
21/09/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 416)
21/09/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
20/02/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1826)
04/11/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 386)
20/06/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3854)
25/03/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3860)
16/03/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3841)
29/11/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 810)
18/05/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22373)
07/11/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22362)
30/11/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22368)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/01/1925 28/03/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5007
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1927 16/04/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 21/07/1928 25/08/1928 36 days General
Boiler number 391 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1929 07/12/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 411 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1931 28/11/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1932 23/07/1932 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 24/08/1935 21/09/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 416 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1937 20/02/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1939 04/11/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1942 20/06/1942 34 days General
Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1944 25/03/1944 62 days General
Boiler number 3860 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1944 23/12/1944 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/02/1946 16/03/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1946 26/10/1946 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/10/1947 29/11/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 810 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 09/05/1949 14/07/1949 67 days General
Renumbered to BR 69822
 
Darlington Works 23/12/1949 04/02/1950 44 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 13/04/1951 18/05/1951 36 days General
Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 24/05/1951 07/06/1951 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/10/1953 07/11/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 17/11/1953 01/12/1953 15 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/12/1953 08/01/1954 19 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 25/10/1955 30/11/1955 37 days General
Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1957 06/07/1957 17 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 28/10/1958 28/10/1958 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/02/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 7
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
17/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5007
   
05/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.    
21/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 391 (Diagram 18)
   
19/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 411 (Diagram 18)
   
05/12/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
24/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18)
   
02/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932.    
24/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 416 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
29/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT)    
30/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
   
07/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
27/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
19/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
29/07/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
26/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
14/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18)
   
25/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
27/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
18/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18)
   
24/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3860 (Diagram 18)
   
09/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944.    
16/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18)
   
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9822    
12/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.    
25/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 29/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 810 (Diagram 18)
   
09/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1949. Dep: 14/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 69822
   
23/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1949. Dep: 04/02/1950.    
05/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (34E)    
13/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1951. Dep: 18/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18)
   
24/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951.    
07/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18)
   
17/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 01/12/1953.    
21/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1953. Dep: 08/01/1954.    
25/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18)
   
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
20/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957.    
28/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/10/1958. Dep: 28/10/1958.    
11/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
03/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69822 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev