|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/01/1925 | 28/03/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5007 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1927 | 16/04/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1928 | 25/08/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 391 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1929 | 07/12/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 411 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1931 | 28/11/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1932 | 23/07/1932 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1935 | 21/09/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 416 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 3860 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1947 | 29/11/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 810 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/05/1949 | 14/07/1949 | 67 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69822 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1949 | 04/02/1950 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1951 | 18/05/1951 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1951 | 07/06/1951 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1953 | 01/12/1953 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1953 | 08/01/1954 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1955 | 30/11/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1958 | 28/10/1958 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/02/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
17/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5007 |
||
05/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927. | ||
21/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1928. Dep: 25/08/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 391 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 07/12/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 411 (Diagram 18) |
||
05/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
24/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1533 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932. | ||
24/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 416 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
29/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) | ||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
27/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
19/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) | ||
29/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
26/02/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
14/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
18/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3854 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3860 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9822 | ||
12/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. | ||
25/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 29/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 810 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1949. Dep: 14/07/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69822 |
||
23/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1949. Dep: 04/02/1950. | ||
05/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
30/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
13/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1951. Dep: 18/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951. | ||
07/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22362 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 01/12/1953. | ||
21/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1953. Dep: 08/01/1954. | ||
25/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22368 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
20/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. | ||
28/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 28/10/1958. Dep: 28/10/1958. | ||
11/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
03/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69822 from Gorton (9G) |