Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 751 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1791 Week
» 11961 Month
» 289757 Year
» 1174138 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 30   17/03/1923
LNER (1924) 5030   11/07/1925
LNER (1946) 9823   31/08/1946
BR 69823   23/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Tue 17/03/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Tue 05/04/1960 off Gorton (9G)
Scrapping During 05/1960 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 37 yrs , 19 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 17/03/1923
CLK Colwick 13/01/1950
39A Gorton 13/06/1954
   Withdrawn 05/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLX   w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 19/06/1954
LOAN 9H Gorton 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 09/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
17/03/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 391)
03/09/1927 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1826)
29/08/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1905)
11/01/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 704)
20/04/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 396)
20/04/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
20/02/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3841)
29/06/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 964)
20/02/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 968)
20/01/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 168)
05/07/1947 Eureka lubricator fitted
05/07/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 210)
23/10/1948 WPU Gear removed
23/10/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3844)
12/08/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3847)
11/04/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22356)
03/04/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22361)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/04/1925 11/07/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5030
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 03/09/1927 50 days General
Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1929 05/10/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 25/07/1931 29/08/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1933 11/11/1933 29 days General  
Gorton Works 30/03/1935 20/04/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1937 20/02/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1938 02/07/1938 36 days General
Boiler number 796 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1940 29/06/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1943 20/02/1943 37 days General  
Gorton Works 06/10/1943 23/10/1943 18 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/12/1944 20/01/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1946 31/08/1946 29 days General
Boiler number 796 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9823
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1947 05/07/1947 22 days General
Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18)
Eureka lubricator fitted
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1948 23/10/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3844 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69823
 
Gateshead Works 22/09/1949 01/11/1949 41 days Light Casual  
Gateshead Works 20/11/1949 23/11/1949 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 24/06/1950 12/08/1950 50 days General
Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 20/06/1951 15/08/1951 57 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 09/03/1953 11/04/1953 34 days General
Boiler number 22356 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 13/04/1953 16/04/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 27/02/1956 03/04/1956 37 days General
Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 22/08/1957 19/09/1957 29 days Light Casual
Frames straightened after collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
17/03/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 30
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
18/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5030
   
16/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 03/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18)
   
17/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1929. Dep: 05/10/1929.    
25/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 18)
   
11/01/1933 Modification Diagram 18 number 704 boiler fitted    
14/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933.    
30/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1935. Dep: 20/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 396 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
30/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3841 (Diagram 18)
   
28/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 796 (Diagram 18)
   
01/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 29/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 964 (Diagram 18)
   
20/02/1942 Modification Diagram 18 number 968 boiler fitted    
15/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.    
06/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943.    
16/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18)
   
03/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 796 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9823
   
14/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 210 (Diagram 18)
Eureka lubricator fitted
   
25/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1948. Dep: 23/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3844 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69823
   
22/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1949. Dep: 01/11/1949.    
20/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1949. Dep: 23/11/1949.    
13/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1950. Dep: 12/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 18)
   
20/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/06/1951. Dep: 15/08/1951.    
09/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22356 (Diagram 18)
   
13/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 16/04/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
27/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1956. Dep: 03/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18)
   
22/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/08/1957. Dep: 19/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Frames straightened after collision
   
05/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69823 from Gorton (9G)    
05/1960 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev