Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 97 Today
» 921 Yesterday
» 4566 Week
» 5456 Month
» 313437 Year
» 1197818 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 46   28/04/1923
LNER (1924) 5046   20/06/1925
LNER (1946) 9825   21/07/1946
BR 69825   29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Mon 28/04/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Mon 30/11/1959 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 12/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 28/04/1923
ARD Ardsley 29/04/1927
NEA Neasden 19/07/1927
CLK Colwick 05/01/1950
38B Annesley 14/10/1956
40E Colwick 14/12/1958
   Withdrawn 30/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 10/11/1956
LOAN 16D Annesley 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley 23/02/1958
LOAN 40E Colwick 4w/e 27/12/1958
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 91E To Eastern Region 5w/e 31/01/1959
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 21/02/1959
WDN   30/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/04/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 395)
08/06/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 386)
27/06/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 672)
27/05/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 156)
06/04/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 845)
06/04/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
03/10/1936 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 278)
05/03/1938 Trip cock gear fitted
05/03/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1795)
18/11/1939 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 713)
26/07/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 714)
09/10/1943 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 174)
08/09/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 772)
16/08/1947 Hudd ATC fitted
16/08/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3852)
29/01/1949 WPU Gear removed
29/01/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3853)
26/05/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22367)
22/12/1953 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22373)
09/07/1956 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22048)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/04/1925 20/06/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5046
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1927 01/10/1927 64 days General  
Gorton Works 21/01/1928 11/02/1928 22 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1929 08/06/1929 78 days General
Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1931 27/06/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 29/04/1933 27/05/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1935 06/04/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1936 03/10/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1938 05/03/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1795 (Diagram 18)
Trip cock gear fitted
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1939 18/11/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1941 26/07/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1943 09/10/1943 106 days General
Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1945 08/09/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1947 16/08/1947 50 days General
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18)
Hudd ATC fitted
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1948 29/01/1949 36 days General
Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69825
 
Gorton Works 21/11/1949 03/12/1949 13 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 12/04/1951 26/05/1951 45 days General
Boiler number 22367 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1951 07/06/1951 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/09/1952 04/10/1952 24 days Heavy Casual  
Darlington Works 21/11/1953 22/12/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 29/11/1955 02/12/1955 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 31/05/1956 09/07/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 22048 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 26/11/1959 26/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/04/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 46
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
11/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5046
   
29/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
19/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
30/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 01/10/1927.    
21/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/01/1928. Dep: 11/02/1928.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
23/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 386 (Diagram 18)
   
23/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
   
29/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1933. Dep: 27/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18)
   
16/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 845 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
05/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 278 (Diagram 18)
   
12/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1938. Dep: 05/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1795 (Diagram 18)
Trip cock gear fitted
   
28/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18)
   
28/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18)
   
26/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18)
   
04/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 772 (Diagram 18)
   
21/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9825    
28/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3852 (Diagram 18)
Hudd ATC fitted
   
25/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1948. Dep: 29/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18)
WPU Gear removed
Renumbered to BR 69825
   
21/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 03/12/1949.    
05/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22367 (Diagram 18)
   
04/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951.    
11/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952.    
21/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1953. Dep: 22/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22373 (Diagram 18)
   
29/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 02/12/1955.    
31/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1956. Dep: 09/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22048 (Diagram 18)
   
14/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
14/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
26/11/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/11/1959. Dep: 26/11/1959.    
30/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69825 from Colwick (40E)    
12/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev