|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 13/06/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5088 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1927 | 13/08/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1929 | 20/07/1929 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1694 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1931 | 06/06/1931 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1933 | 28/10/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1935 | 18/01/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1937 | 07/08/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1939 | 18/02/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 60 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1944 | 29/07/1944 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1946 | 10/08/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1947 | 17/05/1947 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1948 | 15/05/1948 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 3846 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69826 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1948 | 28/08/1948 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1949 | 12/08/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/03/1951 | 19/04/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22370 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1951 | 01/05/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1952 | 07/05/1952 | 36 days | Light Casual | Part 2 built up chimney fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1954 | 15/05/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22376 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1954 | 27/05/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1958 | 21/05/1958 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/05/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 88 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 13/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5088 |
||
25/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 13/08/1927. | ||
13/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1694 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. | ||
07/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 28/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 168 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
10/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1937. Dep: 07/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1905 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 410 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. | ||
17/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3856 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9826 | ||
29/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 10/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947. | ||
13/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1948. Dep: 15/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3846 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69826 |
||
12/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1948. Dep: 28/08/1948. | ||
27/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1949. Dep: 12/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 714 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1951. Dep: 19/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22370 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1951. Dep: 01/05/1951. | ||
26/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
02/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1952. Dep: 07/05/1952. Work undertaken: Part 2 built up chimney fitted |
||
25/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
03/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1954. Dep: 15/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22376 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/05/1954. Dep: 27/05/1954. | ||
03/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. | ||
24/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
21/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 21/05/1958. Dep: 21/05/1958. | ||
02/06/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69826 from Immingham (40B) | ||
07/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |