Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 112 Today
» 925 Yesterday
» 1037 Week
» 18373 Month
» 296169 Year
» 1180550 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 156   16/06/1923
LNER (1924) 5156   05/09/1925
LNER (1946) 9828   27/01/1946
BR 69828   03/07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Gorton Works
To Service Wed 16/06/1923 to Neasden (NEA)
Withdrawal Wed 26/11/1958 off Colwick (40E)
Scrapping During 05/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 35 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden (New) 16/06/1923
40A Lincoln 15/06/1952
40E Langwith Junction 20/09/1953
40A Lincoln 04/10/1953
40E Langwith Junction 15/05/1955
40D Tuxford 11/12/1955
38A Colwick 09/07/1956
39A Gorton 07/10/1956
38A Colwick 19/05/1957
   Withdrawn 26/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 40A Lincoln 4w/e 31/10/1953
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 18/08/1956
ALLOC 39A Gorton 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 15/06/1957
WDN   26/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/06/1923 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 411)
24/08/1929 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 395)
31/10/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1420)
01/07/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 1532)
12/10/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
12/10/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 713)
12/06/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 395)
22/10/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3842)
07/09/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 174)
10/10/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 672)
04/08/1945 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 806)
01/02/1947 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3850)
03/07/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3847)
08/1948 Hudd ATC fitted
30/06/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3846)
13/02/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22389)
18/03/1955 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22372)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 27/06/1925 05/09/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5156
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1925 26/09/1925 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 06/08/1927 08/10/1927 64 days General  
Gorton Works 22/06/1929 24/08/1929 64 days General
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1931 31/10/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 01/07/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 21/04/1934 26/05/1934 36 days General  
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 12/10/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1937 12/06/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1938 22/10/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 3842 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 07/09/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1942 10/10/1942 27 days General
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1943 25/09/1943 11 days General  
Gorton Works 05/09/1944 30/09/1944 26 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/06/1945 04/08/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1946 01/02/1947 50 days General
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1948 03/07/1948 29 days General
Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69828
 
Gorton Works 08/1948 08/1948   Unclassified
Hudd ATC fitted
 
Darlington Works 25/05/1950 30/06/1950 37 days General
Boiler number 3846 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 11/01/1952 13/02/1952 34 days General
Boiler number 22389 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 25/02/1952 05/03/1952 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 15/02/1955 18/03/1955 32 days General
Boiler number 22372 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 20/03/1955 31/03/1955 12 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/10/1956 27/10/1956 4 days Weighing  
Gorton Works 09/01/1957 09/02/1957 32 days Light Casual
Derailment damage
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1957 13/02/1957 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/07/1957 21/08/1957 28 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/06/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 156
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Neasden (NEA)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
27/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5156
   
19/09/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925.    
06/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.    
22/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
   
26/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18)
   
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18)
   
21/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934.    
14/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
22/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18)
   
24/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3842 (Diagram 18)
   
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18)
   
14/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18)
   
15/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943.    
05/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.    
16/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18)
   
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9828    
14/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
New frames & cylinders
Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18)
   
05/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69828
   
08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/08/1948. Dep: ?/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Hudd ATC fitted
   
25/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1950. Dep: 30/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3846 (Diagram 18)
   
11/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22389 (Diagram 18)
   
25/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1952. Dep: 05/03/1952.    
15/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
20/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
04/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (40A)    
15/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22372 (Diagram 18)
   
20/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1955. Dep: 31/03/1955.    
15/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
11/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
09/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
24/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/10/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956.    
09/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Derailment damage
   
10/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1957. Dep: 13/02/1957.    
19/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1957. Dep: 21/08/1957.    
26/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69828 from Colwick (40E)    
05/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev