|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/06/1925 | 05/09/1925 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5156 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1925 | 26/09/1925 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1929 | 24/08/1929 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1931 | 31/10/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1933 | 01/07/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1934 | 26/05/1934 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1935 | 12/10/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1937 | 12/06/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1938 | 22/10/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3842 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1940 | 07/09/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 11 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1944 | 30/09/1944 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1946 | 01/02/1947 | 50 days | General | New frames & cylinders Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1948 | 03/07/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69828 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/1948 | 08/1948 | Unclassified | Hudd ATC fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1950 | 30/06/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3846 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1952 | 13/02/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22389 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1952 | 05/03/1952 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22372 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1955 | 31/03/1955 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 4 days | Weighing | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 32 days | Light Casual | Derailment damage |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1957 | 13/02/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1957 | 21/08/1957 | 28 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/06/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 156 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
27/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 05/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5156 |
||
19/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1925. Dep: 26/09/1925. | ||
06/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. | ||
22/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) |
||
26/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 31/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1420 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1532 (Diagram 18) |
||
21/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934. | ||
14/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 713 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
22/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 395 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3842 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 174 (Diagram 18) |
||
14/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 672 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. | ||
05/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944. | ||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 806 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9828 | ||
14/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947. Work undertaken: New frames & cylinders Boiler number 3850 (Diagram 18) |
||
05/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1948. Dep: 03/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3847 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69828 |
||
08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/08/1948. Dep: ?/08/1948. Work undertaken: Hudd ATC fitted |
||
25/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1950. Dep: 30/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3846 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22389 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/02/1952. Dep: 05/03/1952. | ||
15/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
04/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22372 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/03/1955. Dep: 31/03/1955. | ||
15/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
11/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
09/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
07/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
24/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 24/10/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. | ||
09/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
10/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1957. Dep: 13/02/1957. | ||
19/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
25/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1957. Dep: 21/08/1957. | ||
26/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69828 from Colwick (40E) | ||
05/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |