|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/06/1925 | 19/09/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5158 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1927 | 06/08/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1929 | 23/03/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1931 | 04/04/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1933 | 30/09/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1935 | 04/05/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1936 | 30/01/1937 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1938 | 04/06/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1940 | 06/04/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1942 | 04/07/1942 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 39 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1944 | 12/08/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1945 | 21/04/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1946 | 08/02/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69829 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1950 | 15/04/1950 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1951 | 12/05/1951 | 27 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1952 | 23/05/1952 | 36 days | General | Part 2 built up chimney fitted Boiler number 22386 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1954 | 12/06/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22384 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1954 | 28/06/1954 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1954 | 02/11/1954 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1955 | 12/02/1955 | 4 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1956 | 04/10/1956 | 50 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 158 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 158C | ||
27/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1925. Dep: 19/09/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5158 |
||
18/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1927. Dep: 06/08/1927. | ||
02/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 390 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1931. Dep: 04/04/1931. | ||
16/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) |
||
06/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1935. Dep: 04/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1826 (Diagram 18) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
31/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 30/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 383 (Diagram 18) |
||
14/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 984 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 156 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. | ||
29/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. | ||
10/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 800 (Diagram 18) |
||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9829 | ||
28/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1946. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3853 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3866 (Diagram 18) WPU Gear removed Renumbered to BR 69829 |
||
06/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1950. Dep: 15/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 18) |
||
16/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951. | ||
18/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 23/05/1952. Work undertaken: Part 2 built up chimney fitted Boiler number 22386 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22384 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
15/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 28/06/1954. | ||
01/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/11/1954. Dep: 02/11/1954. | ||
09/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/02/1955. Dep: 12/02/1955. | ||
11/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
08/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) | ||
16/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1956. Dep: 04/10/1956. | ||
17/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/05/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69829 from Immingham (40B) | ||
06/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Stratford |