|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 27/10/1925 | 04/11/1925 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 01/06/1926 | 02/06/1926 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/09/1927 | 23/01/1928 | 129 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 19/02/1930 | 11/04/1930 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1933 | 05/10/1933 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1936 | 10/09/1936 | 59 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1937 | 11/06/1937 | 12 days | Unclassified | Special bunker fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1939 | 08/03/1939 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1941 | 14/05/1941 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3621 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1943 | 02/02/1943 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1943 | 07/05/1943 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 107 days | General | Two new 1⅛" part frames Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1946 | 25/05/1946 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9830 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/08/1946 | 16/08/1946 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/04/1947 | 22/05/1947 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1948 | 07/05/1948 | 80 days | General | Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69830 |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1949 | 14/10/1949 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22366 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1951 | 10/02/1951 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22374 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/01/1952 | 06/03/1952 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/01/1953 | 17/01/1953 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22371 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1955 | 11/08/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22392 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1956 | 07/02/1957 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/04/1958 | Saltburn MPD | The allocation of this shed (transferred to Middlesbrough 3rd Feb.) are in store here, viz.: 69830/1/3/42/66/9. | SLS/195805 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/09/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1712 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3616 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
22/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
27/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1925. Dep: 04/11/1925. | ||
01/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1926. Dep: 02/06/1926. | ||
17/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1927. Dep: 23/01/1928. | ||
21/08/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
19/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1930. Dep: 11/04/1930. | ||
29/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1933. Dep: 05/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
14/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1936. Dep: 10/09/1936. | ||
31/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1937. Dep: 11/06/1937. Work undertaken: Special bunker fitted |
||
31/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
23/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 08/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
07/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1941. Dep: 14/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3621 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/01/1943. Dep: 02/02/1943. | ||
07/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1943. Dep: 07/05/1943. | ||
08/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Two new 1⅛" part frames Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1946. Dep: 25/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9830 |
||
16/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/08/1946. Dep: 16/08/1946. | ||
29/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1947. Dep: 22/05/1947. | ||
18/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69830 |
||
06/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1949. Dep: 14/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22366 (Diagram 18) |
||
17/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1951. Dep: 10/02/1951. | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22374 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1952. Dep: 06/03/1952. | ||
08/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 17/01/1953. | ||
11/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22371 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 11/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22392 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/12/1956. Dep: 07/02/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
02/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
18/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69830 from Thornaby (51L) |