Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 652 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4783 Week
» 14953 Month
» 292749 Year
» 1177130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1719   03/10/1925
LNER (1946) 9831   20/07/1946
BR 69831   10/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorne Leslie
Works Number 3617
To Service Thu 03/10/1925 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Thu 27/11/1958 off Thornaby (51L)
Scrapping During 05/1959 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) 03/10/1925
NEV Neville Hill 10/10/1925
DAR Darlington m/e 03/1926
GHD Gateshead 20/05/1926
HTN Heaton 21/08/1929
SALT Saltburn 26/06/1930
DAR Darlington 21/03/1939
SALT Saltburn 17/07/1949
51A Darlington 13/06/1954
51E Stockton 13/02/1955
51A Darlington 25/09/1955
51C West Hartlepool 15/09/1957
51K Saltburn 10/11/1957
51D Middlesbrough 02/02/1958
51L Thornaby 01/06/1958
   Withdrawn 27/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SAL Salisbury w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 51K Saltburn 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 51D Middlesbrough 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 51L Thornaby 08/06/1958
WDN   27/11/1958
TOSTORE   4w/e 27/12/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/10/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3617)
15/01/1932 Steam Brake fitted
15/01/1932 Westinghouse Brake removed
05/01/1934 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3619)
29/11/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3628)
11/03/1938 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3617)
06/04/1940 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3624)
15/05/1942 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3619)
10/06/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3622)
20/07/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3625)
10/09/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3871)
16/09/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22354)
28/03/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22385)
02/10/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3857)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 19/10/1925 30/10/1925 12 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 29/06/1926 02/07/1926 4 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 30/09/1927 11/11/1927 43 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 31/01/1929 28/03/1929 57 days General  
Gateshead Works 16/04/1929 17/04/1929 2 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 19/11/1931 15/01/1932 58 days General
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Darlington Works 29/11/1933 05/01/1934 38 days General
Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 05/02/1934 15/03/1934 39 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 21/10/1935 29/11/1935 40 days General
Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 25/01/1938 11/03/1938 46 days General
Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 08/12/1938 08/12/1938 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 13/09/1939 21/09/1939 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 29/02/1940 06/04/1940 38 days General
Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 14/04/1942 15/05/1942 32 days General
Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 05/06/1942 09/06/1942 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/11/1942 05/11/1942 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 09/05/1944 10/06/1944 33 days General
Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1946 19/01/1946 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/05/1946 20/07/1946 54 days General
Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9831
 
Darlington Works 07/10/1946 10/10/1946 4 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 25/03/1947 11/04/1947 18 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 10/08/1947 01/09/1947 23 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 06/08/1948 10/09/1948 36 days General
Boiler number 3871 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69831
 
Darlington Works 15/08/1950 16/09/1950 33 days General
Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 26/02/1952 28/03/1952 32 days General
Boiler number 22385 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 03/04/1952 07/04/1952 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/06/1953 10/08/1953 47 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 15/10/1953 20/10/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 14/08/1954 02/10/1954 50 days General
Boiler number 3857 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 30/08/1956 30/08/1956 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 04/02/1957 08/03/1957 33 days Heavy Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/10/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 1719
Built at Hawthorne Leslie, Works Number 3617
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
10/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
19/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1925. Dep: 30/10/1925.    
03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
20/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
29/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1926. Dep: 02/07/1926.    
30/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1927. Dep: 11/11/1927.    
31/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1929. Dep: 28/03/1929.    
16/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1929. Dep: 17/04/1929.    
21/08/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
26/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
19/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1931. Dep: 15/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
29/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1933. Dep: 05/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18)
   
05/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1934. Dep: 15/03/1934.    
21/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1935. Dep: 29/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18)
   
25/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1938. Dep: 11/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18)
   
08/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/12/1938. Dep: 08/12/1938.    
21/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
13/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1939. Dep: 21/09/1939.    
29/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18)
   
14/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1942. Dep: 15/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18)
   
05/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1942. Dep: 09/06/1942.    
05/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/11/1942. Dep: 05/11/1942.    
09/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18)
   
17/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1946. Dep: 19/01/1946.    
28/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1946. Dep: 20/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9831
   
07/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/10/1946. Dep: 10/10/1946.    
25/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1947. Dep: 11/04/1947.    
10/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1947. Dep: 01/09/1947.    
06/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1948. Dep: 10/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3871 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69831
   
17/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
15/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18)
   
26/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1952. Dep: 28/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22385 (Diagram 18)
   
03/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1952. Dep: 07/04/1952.    
25/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/06/1953. Dep: 10/08/1953.    
15/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/10/1953. Dep: 20/10/1953.    
13/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
14/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3857 (Diagram 18)
   
15/08/1954 Sightings Gorton Works visit: Around the works. RO 9/1954 Link
13/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
25/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
30/08/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/08/1956. Dep: 30/08/1956.    
04/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957.    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
10/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (51K)    
02/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D)    
01/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
27/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69831 from Thornaby (51L)    
05/1959 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    

prev prev