Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 825 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3385 Week
» 16418 Month
» 238819 Year
» 1123200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1738   22/10/1925
LNER (1946) 9832   17/03/1946
BR 69832   27/08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorne Leslie
Works Number 3618
To Service Mon 22/10/1925 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Mon 06/10/1958 off Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)
Scrapping During 10/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) 22/10/1925
HTN Heaton 07/12/1925
BLA Blaydon m/e 02/1926
SALT Saltburn 28/05/1928
DAR Darlington 17/04/1939
30A Stratford 08/04/1951
51A Darlington 20/05/1951
53B Hull Botanic Gardens 15/09/1957
   Withdrawn 06/10/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/04/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 53B Hull Botanic Gardens 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   06/10/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
22/10/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3618)
16/06/1931 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 152)
13/06/1933 Westinghouse Brake removed
13/06/1933 Steam Brake fitted
13/06/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3622)
12/01/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3625)
09/08/1941 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3622)
07/04/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3625)
28/08/1946 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3620)
27/08/1948 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3865)
11/10/1950 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22355)
20/09/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22394)
20/11/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22385)
08/03/1957 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22355)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 04/11/1925 16/11/1925 13 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 22/02/1926 10/03/1926 17 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 08/06/1926 10/06/1926 3 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 11/01/1929 15/03/1929 64 days General  
Darlington Works 29/04/1929 07/05/1929 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/08/1929 06/09/1929 32 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/04/1931 16/06/1931 70 days General
Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 03/05/1933 13/06/1933 42 days General
Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18)
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Darlington Works 05/11/1934 12/01/1935 69 days General
Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 17/01/1935 19/01/1935 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 23/01/1935 13/03/1935 50 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 30/10/1935 07/01/1936 70 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/06/1936 30/07/1936 46 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 14/12/1936 06/04/1937 114 days General  
Darlington Works 06/02/1939 29/03/1939 52 days General  
Darlington Works 19/09/1940 02/11/1940 45 days General  
Darlington Works 16/06/1941 09/08/1941 55 days General
Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 08/09/1941 11/09/1941 4 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 25/11/1941 29/11/1941 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/02/1942 26/02/1942 9 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 05/03/1942 10/03/1942 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 17/07/1942 04/08/1942 19 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 28/08/1942 15/09/1942 19 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 20/01/1943 04/02/1943 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 13/03/1944 07/04/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/05/1944 02/05/1944 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 16/05/1944 20/05/1944 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 06/05/1946 28/08/1946 115 days General
Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/09/1946 11/09/1946 10 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 11/06/1947 11/06/1947 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 29/06/1948 27/08/1948 60 days General
Boiler number 3865 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69832
 
Darlington Works 16/09/1948 21/09/1948 6 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/08/1949 17/08/1949 15 days Light Casual  
Darlington Works 29/08/1949 29/08/1949 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 11/09/1950 11/10/1950 31 days General
Boiler number 22355 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 27/08/1952 20/09/1952 25 days General
Boiler number 22394 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 27/08/1953 27/08/1953 1 day Weighing  
Gorton Works 02/10/1954 20/11/1954 50 days General
Boiler number 22385 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1956 17/04/1956 47 days Heavy Casual
After collision
 
Darlington Works 11/02/1957 08/03/1957 26 days General
Boiler number 22355 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 11/03/1957 12/03/1957 2 days Unclassified  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 1738
Built at Hawthorne Leslie, Works Number 3618
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
04/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1925. Dep: 16/11/1925.    
07/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
22/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1926. Dep: 10/03/1926.    
08/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1926. Dep: 10/06/1926.    
28/05/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT)    
11/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1929. Dep: 15/03/1929.    
29/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1929. Dep: 07/05/1929.    
06/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1929. Dep: 06/09/1929.    
08/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1931. Dep: 16/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18)
   
03/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1933. Dep: 13/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18)
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
05/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1934. Dep: 12/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18)
   
17/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1935. Dep: 19/01/1935.    
23/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1935. Dep: 13/03/1935.    
30/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1935. Dep: 07/01/1936.    
15/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1936. Dep: 30/07/1936.    
14/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1936. Dep: 06/04/1937.    
06/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1939. Dep: 29/03/1939.    
17/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
19/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940.    
16/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1941. Dep: 09/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 11/09/1941.    
25/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941.    
18/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1942. Dep: 26/02/1942.    
05/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1942. Dep: 10/03/1942.    
17/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/07/1942. Dep: 04/08/1942.    
28/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/08/1942. Dep: 15/09/1942.    
20/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1943. Dep: 04/02/1943.    
13/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18)
   
02/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/05/1944. Dep: 02/05/1944.    
16/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/05/1944. Dep: 20/05/1944.    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9832    
06/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1946. Dep: 28/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18)
   
02/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1946. Dep: 11/09/1946.    
11/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/06/1947. Dep: 11/06/1947.    
29/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3865 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69832
   
16/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1948. Dep: 21/09/1948.    
03/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1949. Dep: 17/08/1949.    
29/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/08/1949. Dep: 29/08/1949.    
11/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 11/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22355 (Diagram 18)
   
08/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
27/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22394 (Diagram 18)
   
27/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 27/08/1953. Dep: 27/08/1953.    
02/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22385 (Diagram 18)
   
02/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1956. Dep: 17/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22355 (Diagram 18)
   
11/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 12/03/1957.    
15/09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    
10/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
06/10/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69832 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B)    

prev prev