|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 14/07/1926 | 16/07/1926 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/04/1929 | 04/07/1929 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/11/1930 | 27/01/1931 | 71 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/06/1932 | 30/06/1932 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1932 | 04/12/1932 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1934 | 10/11/1934 | 16 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1936 | 02/10/1936 | 110 days | General | Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1936 | 23/10/1936 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1939 | 19/05/1939 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1939 | 20/06/1939 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1941 | 08/08/1941 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1942 | 23/12/1942 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1944 | 03/03/1944 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1945 | 31/08/1945 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1946 | 18/04/1946 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1946 | 08/05/1946 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1947 | 20/10/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1948 | 09/04/1948 | 47 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69834 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1948 | 06/01/1949 | 97 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1949 | 14/10/1949 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1949 | 09/01/1950 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1950 | 04/02/1950 | 18 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1950 | 31/05/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1950 | 29/09/1950 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/01/1951 | 22/01/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1952 | 11/02/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1952 | 07/06/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1952 | 10/06/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1952 | 11/07/1952 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/08/1952 | 03/10/1952 | 39 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22355 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1952 | 23/10/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/07/1954 | 04/09/1954 | 57 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1956 | 14/11/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22358 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1957 | 06/08/1957 | 37 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
04/05/1959 | Darlington area | The withdrawn engines at Fighting Cocks and on the Barnard Castle branch were still there on 4th May, except that the Broomielaw ones were observed in the scrap yard at Darlington. North Road station contained 62754, 69810/34/42/63/4. Sentinel 68150 (50C) arrived for scrap 6th May (last in Capital stock). | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/11/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1756 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3620 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
14/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/07/1926. Dep: 16/07/1926. | ||
25/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
25/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1929. Dep: 04/07/1929. | ||
18/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1930. Dep: 27/01/1931. | ||
10/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1932. Dep: 30/06/1932. | ||
01/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1932. Dep: 04/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
10/05/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
26/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1934. Dep: 10/11/1934. | ||
28/05/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
15/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1936. Dep: 02/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1936. Dep: 23/10/1936. | ||
20/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1939. Dep: 19/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
31/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/05/1939. Dep: 20/06/1939. | ||
23/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1941. Dep: 08/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3625 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 23/12/1942. | ||
01/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1944. Dep: 03/03/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1945. Dep: 31/08/1945. | ||
13/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1946. Dep: 18/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18) |
||
25/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1946. Dep: 08/05/1946. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9834 | ||
20/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 20/10/1947. Dep: 20/10/1947. | ||
23/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1948. Dep: 09/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69834 |
||
09/09/1948 | Modification | Diagram 18 number 152 boiler fitted | ||
02/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 06/01/1949. | ||
13/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
19/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) | ||
20/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. | ||
16/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/09/1949. Dep: 14/10/1949. | ||
15/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1949. Dep: 09/01/1950. | ||
18/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1950. Dep: 04/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3864 (Diagram 18) |
||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 31/05/1950. | ||
03/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 22/01/1951. | ||
11/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/02/1952. Dep: 11/02/1952. | ||
14/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1952. Dep: 07/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1952. Dep: 10/06/1952. | ||
23/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1952. Dep: 11/07/1952. | ||
26/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1952. Dep: 03/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22355 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1952. Dep: 23/10/1952. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
10/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/07/1954. Dep: 04/09/1954. | ||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
13/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
01/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22358 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1957. Dep: 06/08/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
02/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
11/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
11/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69834 from Thornaby (51L) |