|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 28/04/1926 | 17/05/1926 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/09/1927 | 29/12/1927 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1929 | 29/01/1930 | 66 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/02/1932 | 15/03/1932 | 43 days | General | Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/01/1934 | 19/02/1934 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1935 | 14/06/1935 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1937 | 07/04/1937 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1939 | 13/04/1939 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1939 | 26/04/1939 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1940 | 29/08/1940 | 51 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1941 | 02/04/1941 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1941 | 19/07/1941 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1941 | 06/08/1941 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1941 | 15/08/1941 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1943 | 30/06/1943 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22366 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/04/1946 | 29/05/1946 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1947 | 17/05/1947 | 94 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1947 | 06/06/1947 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1948 | 13/02/1948 | 35 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9835 |
||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1949 | 07/04/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3870 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69835 |
||
Darlington Works | 14/04/1949 | 02/05/1949 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/12/1950 | 10/01/1951 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22360 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1952 | 20/11/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1952 | 17/01/1953 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 23/01/1953 | 28/01/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1954 | 20/01/1955 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 22394 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1957 | 18/04/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22374 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1957 | 26/04/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/11/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1760 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3621 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
02/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/04/1926. Dep: 17/05/1926. | ||
30/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1927. Dep: 29/12/1927. | ||
25/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
25/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1929. Dep: 29/01/1930. | ||
02/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1932. Dep: 15/03/1932. Work undertaken: Steam Brakes fitted |
||
12/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1934. Dep: 19/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) |
||
08/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1935. Dep: 14/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1937. Dep: 07/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1939. Dep: 13/04/1939. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
14/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1939. Dep: 26/04/1939. | ||
10/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1940. Dep: 29/08/1940. | ||
02/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 02/04/1941. Dep: 02/04/1941. | ||
02/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1941. Dep: 19/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/07/1941. Dep: 06/08/1941. | ||
12/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1941. Dep: 15/08/1941. | ||
24/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1943. Dep: 30/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22366 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
27/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/04/1946. Dep: 29/05/1946. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9835 | ||
13/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1947. Dep: 17/05/1947. | ||
29/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/05/1947. Dep: 06/06/1947. | ||
10/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9835 |
||
09/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1949. Dep: 07/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3870 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69835 |
||
14/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1949. Dep: 02/05/1949. | ||
06/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1950. Dep: 10/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22360 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
05/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
20/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 20/11/1952. Dep: 20/11/1952. | ||
08/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/12/1952. Dep: 17/01/1953. | ||
23/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1953. Dep: 28/01/1953. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
13/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 20/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22394 (Diagram 18) |
||
22/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1957. Dep: 18/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22374 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1957. Dep: 26/04/1957. | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
26/11/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69835 from Stockton (51E) | ||
06/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |