|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 01/09/1926 | 14/09/1926 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 18/07/1928 | 21/09/1928 | 66 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/12/1928 | 14/12/1928 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1929 | 06/11/1929 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1930 | 31/12/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 29/11/1932 | 17/01/1933 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 18/01/1935 | 23/02/1935 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/03/1935 | 26/03/1935 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/10/1936 | 20/02/1937 | 136 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1937 | 05/03/1937 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1938 | 24/03/1939 | 123 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1939 | 28/03/1939 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1941 | 09/06/1941 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1943 | 08/03/1943 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1943 | 31/12/1943 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1944 | 20/01/1944 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1945 | 05/02/1945 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/12/1945 | 11/12/1945 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/01/1946 | 25/01/1946 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1946 | 15/06/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1946 | 08/07/1946 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1947 | 01/05/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Gateshead Works | 09/07/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1948 | 03/03/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1948 | 28/05/1948 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69837 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1948 | 21/06/1948 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1949 | 12/10/1949 | 42 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1950 | 08/07/1950 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1950 | 25/08/1950 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/06/1952 | 05/06/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 11/06/1952 | 11/06/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 26/06/1952 | 26/06/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22350 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1954 | 23/10/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1958 | 20/02/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/12/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1767 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3623 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
20/05/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
01/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1926. Dep: 14/09/1926. | ||
28/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
18/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1928. Dep: 21/09/1928. | ||
06/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1928. Dep: 14/12/1928. | ||
08/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1929. Dep: 06/11/1929. | ||
11/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930. | ||
29/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1932. Dep: 17/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
18/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/03/1935. Dep: 26/03/1935. | ||
08/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1936. Dep: 20/02/1937. | ||
23/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1937. Dep: 05/03/1937. | ||
11/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. | ||
22/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1938. Dep: 24/03/1939. | ||
27/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1939. Dep: 28/03/1939. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
28/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1941. Dep: 09/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 08/03/1943. | ||
15/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1943. Dep: 31/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3627 (Diagram 18) |
||
10/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/01/1944. Dep: 20/01/1944. | ||
13/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/01/1945. Dep: 05/02/1945. | ||
11/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1945. Dep: 11/12/1945. | ||
01/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1946. Dep: 25/01/1946. | ||
15/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1946. Dep: 15/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18) |
||
24/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1946. Dep: 08/07/1946. | ||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9837 | ||
01/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 01/05/1947. Dep: 01/05/1947. | ||
09/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/07/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
03/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 03/03/1948. Dep: 03/03/1948. | ||
03/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1948. Dep: 28/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69837 |
||
04/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1948. Dep: 21/06/1948. | ||
01/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1949. Dep: 12/10/1949. | ||
23/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1950. Dep: 08/07/1950. | ||
09/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1950. Dep: 25/08/1950. | ||
18/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
20/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
26/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
05/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/06/1952. Dep: 05/06/1952. | ||
11/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 11/06/1952. | ||
26/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/06/1952. Dep: 26/06/1952. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22350 (Diagram 18) |
||
18/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22383 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1958. Dep: 20/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22354 (Diagram 18) |
||
12/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington | ||
03/12/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69837 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |