Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 140 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1180 Week
» 11350 Month
» 289146 Year
» 1173527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 1768   23/12/1925
LNER (1946) 9838   11/08/1946
BR (Tmp) E9838   20/02/1948
BR 69838   03/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class A5
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2T
Builder Hawthorne Leslie
Works Number 3624
To Service Wed 23/12/1925 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Wed 05/11/1958 off Stockton (51E)
Scrapping During 11/1958 at Locomotive Works (Darlington)
Service Life 32 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) 23/12/1925
BLA Blaydon 14/01/1926
HTN Heaton 27/06/1928
MID Middlesbrough 26/06/1930
DAR Darlington 20/03/1939
30A Stratford 15/04/1951
51A Darlington 20/05/1951
51E Stockton 19/06/1955
   Withdrawn 05/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 51A Darlington w/e 26/05/1951
ALLOC 51E Stockton 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   05/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/12/1925 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3624)
31/03/1933 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3623)
31/03/1933 Steam Brake fitted
31/03/1933 Westinghouse Brake removed
23/04/1935 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3624)
11/05/1937 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3623)
23/09/1944 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3626)
03/03/1949 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 3619)
20/01/1951 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22361)
06/09/1952 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22352)
30/10/1954 Diagram 18 boiler fitted (number 22377)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gateshead Works 01/07/1926 08/07/1926 8 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 26/08/1926 02/09/1926 8 days Light Repair  
Gateshead Works 03/04/1928 14/06/1928 73 days General  
Darlington Works 13/01/1931 03/03/1931 50 days General  
Gateshead Works 16/10/1931 16/12/1931 62 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Darlington Works 15/02/1933 31/03/1933 45 days General
Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18)
Westinghouse Brake removed
 
Darlington Works 26/02/1935 23/04/1935 57 days General
Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 25/03/1937 11/05/1937 48 days General
Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 13/07/1937 30/07/1937 18 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/09/1937 23/12/1937 102 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 09/02/1939 09/02/1939 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 13/09/1939 19/09/1939 7 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/03/1940 26/04/1940 40 days General  
Darlington Works 13/02/1941 13/02/1941 1 day Weighing  
Darlington Works 25/04/1941 15/05/1941 21 days General  
Darlington Works 02/03/1942 03/03/1942 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 18/04/1942 23/06/1942 67 days General  
Darlington Works 18/08/1944 23/09/1944 37 days General
Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 15/11/1945 17/01/1946 64 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 20/11/1946 01/02/1947 74 days General  
Darlington Works 22/04/1947 09/05/1947 18 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 10/02/1948 20/02/1948 11 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9838
 
Darlington Works 26/01/1949 03/03/1949 37 days General
Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69838
 
Darlington Works 29/06/1950 30/06/1950 2 days Weighing  
Darlington Works 23/08/1950 25/08/1950 3 days Weighing  
Darlington Works 12/12/1950 20/01/1951 40 days General
Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 22/01/1951 24/01/1951 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 12/08/1952 06/09/1952 26 days General
Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 08/09/1952 09/09/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 21/10/1952 04/12/1952 45 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 18/09/1954 30/10/1954 43 days General
Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18)
 
Darlington Works 09/01/1958 31/01/1958 23 days Light Casual
After collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
23/12/1925 To Service To service as LNER Number 1768
Built at Hawthorne Leslie, Works Number 3624
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 18 boiler fitted
   
14/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA)    
01/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1926. Dep: 08/07/1926.    
26/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1926. Dep: 02/09/1926.    
03/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1928. Dep: 14/06/1928.    
27/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
26/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID)    
13/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1931. Dep: 03/03/1931.    
16/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1931. Dep: 16/12/1931.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
15/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1933. Dep: 31/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18)
Westinghouse Brake removed
   
26/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1935. Dep: 23/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18)
   
25/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1937. Dep: 11/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3623 (Diagram 18)
   
13/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1937. Dep: 30/07/1937.    
13/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/09/1937. Dep: 23/12/1937.    
09/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/02/1939. Dep: 09/02/1939.    
20/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
13/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/09/1939. Dep: 19/09/1939.    
18/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1940. Dep: 26/04/1940.    
13/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/02/1941. Dep: 13/02/1941.    
25/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1941. Dep: 15/05/1941.    
02/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1942. Dep: 03/03/1942.    
18/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1942. Dep: 23/06/1942.    
18/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1944. Dep: 23/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18)
   
15/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/11/1945. Dep: 17/01/1946.    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9838    
20/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1946. Dep: 01/02/1947.    
22/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1947. Dep: 09/05/1947.    
10/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E9838
   
26/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1949. Dep: 03/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18)
Renumbered to BR 69838
   
29/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/06/1950. Dep: 30/06/1950.    
23/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 25/08/1950.    
12/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22361 (Diagram 18)
   
22/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1951. Dep: 24/01/1951.    
15/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
12/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18)
   
08/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1952. Dep: 09/09/1952.    
21/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952.    
18/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22377 (Diagram 18)
   
19/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stockton (51E)    
09/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1958. Dep: 31/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington    
05/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69838 from Stockton (51E)    

prev prev