|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 28/07/1926 | 30/07/1926 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 23/01/1928 | 27/03/1928 | 65 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/02/1930 | 28/03/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1930 | 11/09/1930 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 15/12/1930 | 24/12/1930 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1932 | 24/10/1932 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1933 | 31/01/1934 | 134 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1934 | 14/02/1935 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/05/1935 | 18/06/1935 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1936 | 28/01/1937 | 108 days | General | Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1938 | 30/06/1938 | 79 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1939 | 12/05/1939 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1939 | 09/06/1939 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 07/07/1941 | 26/08/1941 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1943 | 16/07/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1943 | 03/09/1943 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1944 | 18/02/1944 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1944 | 29/08/1944 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1945 | 10/05/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 17/07/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3863 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1947 | 25/03/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 16/04/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 95 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1947 | 01/09/1947 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1949 | 14/04/1949 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3874 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69839 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/02/1951 | 09/03/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22359 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1951 | 20/03/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/11/1951 | 06/12/1951 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1952 | 08/07/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22396 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1953 | 07/04/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1955 | 14/04/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1955 | 29/04/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1956 | 18/08/1956 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1956 | 11/01/1957 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1957 | 16/01/1957 | 1 day | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/01/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1771 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3625 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
14/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
28/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/07/1926. Dep: 30/07/1926. | ||
23/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1928. Dep: 27/03/1928. | ||
27/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
06/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1930. Dep: 28/03/1930. | ||
26/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
01/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/09/1930. Dep: 11/09/1930. | ||
15/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/12/1930. Dep: 24/12/1930. | ||
24/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1932. Dep: 24/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3618 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
20/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1933. Dep: 31/01/1934. | ||
12/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1934. Dep: 14/02/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3622 (Diagram 18) |
||
20/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1935. Dep: 18/06/1935. | ||
13/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1936. Dep: 28/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
13/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/04/1938. Dep: 30/06/1938. | ||
20/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
22/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1939. Dep: 12/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/06/1939. Dep: 09/06/1939. | ||
07/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1941. Dep: 26/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3620 (Diagram 18) |
||
02/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1943. Dep: 16/07/1943. | ||
17/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1943. Dep: 03/09/1943. | ||
03/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1944. Dep: 18/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) |
||
29/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 29/08/1944. | ||
10/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/05/1945. Dep: 10/05/1945. | ||
17/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3863 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9839 | ||
25/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 25/03/1947. Dep: 25/03/1947. | ||
16/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. | ||
22/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. | ||
13/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/08/1947. Dep: 01/09/1947. | ||
22/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1949. Dep: 14/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3874 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69839 |
||
18/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. | ||
05/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22359 (Diagram 18) |
||
19/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1951. Dep: 20/03/1951. | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
22/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1951. Dep: 06/12/1951. | ||
08/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 08/07/1952. Dep: 08/07/1952. | ||
14/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22396 (Diagram 18) |
||
07/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/04/1953. Dep: 07/04/1953. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
19/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22352 (Diagram 18) |
||
26/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/04/1955. Dep: 29/04/1955. | ||
10/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956. | ||
07/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/12/1956. Dep: 11/01/1957. | ||
16/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/01/1957. Dep: 16/01/1957. | ||
19/09/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69839 from Darlington (51A) | ||
10/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |