|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 29/04/1926 | 15/06/1926 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 15/03/1928 | 26/05/1928 | 73 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/08/1929 | 03/09/1929 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/04/1930 | 07/06/1930 | 40 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 12/06/1930 | 21/06/1930 | 10 days | Special | Painting |
||
Gateshead Works | 09/02/1932 | 18/03/1932 | 39 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1934 | 06/08/1934 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3621 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1936 | 14/08/1936 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/10/1938 | 17/12/1938 | 55 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1940 | 19/04/1940 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1941 | 25/04/1941 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/04/1942 | 27/04/1942 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1942 | 22/09/1942 | 25 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1942 | 07/01/1943 | 37 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1943 | 09/08/1943 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/12/1943 | 11/02/1944 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1944 | 27/06/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | After collision (bogie damage) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1944 | 14/07/1944 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/02/1945 | 23/02/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 05/03/1945 | 05/03/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1945 | 15/05/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9840 |
||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1947 | 17/04/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 44 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/07/1947 | 19/07/1947 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 22/07/1947 | 30/07/1947 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/03/1948 | 07/05/1948 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3872 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69840 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1949 | 07/12/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3863 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1950 | 26/04/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 04/07/1951 | 04/07/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1951 | 09/07/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1951 | 14/09/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22378 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1952 | 23/10/1952 | 31 days | HfI | |||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1953 | 04/05/1953 | 15 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1954 | 10/07/1954 | 36 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 15/03/1956 | 23/04/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22371 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1956 | 02/05/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1956 | 03/07/1956 | 39 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/10/1957 | 11/12/1957 | 51 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22359 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1958 | 01/06/1958 | 1 day | S | To store |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/01/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1782 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3626 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
29/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/04/1926. Dep: 15/06/1926. | ||
15/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. | ||
27/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
21/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1929. Dep: 03/09/1929. | ||
29/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. | ||
12/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Special) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930. Work undertaken: Painting |
||
09/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1932. Dep: 18/03/1932. | ||
27/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1934. Dep: 06/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3621 (Diagram 18) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
30/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1936. Dep: 14/08/1936. | ||
24/08/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
24/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1938. Dep: 17/12/1938. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
19/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 19/04/1940. Dep: 19/04/1940. | ||
22/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1941. Dep: 25/04/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3628 (Diagram 18) |
||
03/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1942. Dep: 27/04/1942. | ||
29/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 22/09/1942. | ||
02/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1942. Dep: 07/01/1943. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
24/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1943. Dep: 09/08/1943. | ||
22/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1943. Dep: 11/02/1944. | ||
03/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1944. Dep: 27/06/1944. Work undertaken: After collision (bogie damage) |
||
14/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 14/07/1944. Dep: 14/07/1944. | ||
23/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/02/1945. Dep: 23/02/1945. | ||
05/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/03/1945. Dep: 05/03/1945. | ||
15/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 15/05/1945. Dep: 15/05/1945. | ||
08/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 947 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9840 |
||
17/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/04/1947. Dep: 17/04/1947. | ||
16/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. | ||
08/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1947. Dep: 19/07/1947. | ||
22/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1947. Dep: 30/07/1947. | ||
22/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1948. Dep: 07/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3872 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69840 |
||
01/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1949. Dep: 07/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3863 (Diagram 18) |
||
26/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/04/1950. Dep: 26/04/1950. | ||
11/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
17/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/07/1951. Dep: 04/07/1951. | ||
09/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 09/07/1951. | ||
13/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1951. Dep: 14/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22378 (Diagram 18) |
||
23/09/1952 | Works Visit | |||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 04/05/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
05/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1954. Dep: 10/07/1954. | ||
15/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1956. Dep: 23/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22371 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 02/05/1956. | ||
26/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1956. Dep: 03/07/1956. | ||
22/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 11/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22359 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/06/1958 | Works Visit | |||
22/09/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69840 from Darlington (51A) | ||
10/1958 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |