|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 07/04/1926 | 16/04/1926 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/08/1926 | 22/10/1926 | 58 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1929 | 21/12/1929 | 62 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/12/1930 | 29/01/1931 | 53 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 16/09/1931 | 07/10/1931 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 24/02/1932 | 18/04/1932 | 55 days | General | Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1932 | 08/09/1932 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1935 | 14/10/1935 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/04/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1937 | 09/08/1937 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1938 | 23/06/1938 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1939 | 12/04/1939 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1939 | 09/05/1939 | 5 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1939 | 01/12/1939 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1942 | 10/07/1942 | 71 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/04/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1944 | 06/09/1944 | 120 days | General | Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1945 | 28/11/1945 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/09/1947 | 06/10/1947 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1947 | 05/11/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 19/11/1948 | 23/12/1948 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69842 |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1949 | 22/01/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 27/04/1949 | 18/05/1949 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1950 | 14/06/1950 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1950 | 22/06/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 24/06/1950 | 01/07/1950 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/12/1950 | 27/01/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 28/03/1951 | 03/04/1951 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1951 | 26/11/1951 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1952 | 28/06/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1952 | 17/07/1952 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1952 | 01/09/1952 | 28 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1954 | 30/10/1954 | 43 days | General | Into store at Saltburn shed, 10/11/57 Boiler number 22040 (Diagram 18) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Further new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60134-37, ex North Road bear Works, Nos. 2053-56, in order. Locomotives awaiting Works: Nos. 970, 1642/44/72, 2344/65/90, 2715, E2718, 3292, E3311, E3314, 3399, 3420, 5100, 5856, 7283, 7636/69, 8015, 8275, 8313, 8698, 8745, 9792, 9842/89, 60942, 62737/64, 63290, 67672, 67719/23 (both light repairs), 69784. The following were sent to the scrap yard:-Nos. 3253/92/95, 3323/27, 8090 an 9103. Locomotives ex Works: Nos. 60507 (unlined black, new chimney), 61019, 61627/38, 62371/91, 62708/47, 63140, 63344/58, 65706/17, 65803/14/32/52/83/89, 67300, 67311 (auto fitted), 67312, 67688, 68014 (altered bunker), 68245/95, 68426, 68678 (vacuum ejector), 68699, 69776, 69841/81/91, 69862 (first 'A.8' to be lined out), 69881/91, 'Austerity' 77050, 77195/99, 77329. |
SLS/194901 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
19/04/1958 | Saltburn MPD | The allocation of this shed (transferred to Middlesbrough 3rd Feb.) are in store here, viz.: 69830/1/3/42/66/9. | SLS/195805 |
04/05/1959 | Darlington area | The withdrawn engines at Fighting Cocks and on the Barnard Castle branch were still there on 4th May, except that the Broomielaw ones were observed in the scrap yard at Darlington. North Road station contained 62754, 69810/34/42/63/4. Sentinel 68150 (50C) arrived for scrap 6th May (last in Capital stock). | SLS/195907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/03/1926 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1790 Built at Hawthorn Leslie, Works Number 3628 Allocated to Blaydon (BLA) Diagram 18 boiler fitted |
||
07/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1926. Dep: 16/04/1926. | ||
26/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1926. Dep: 22/10/1926. | ||
25/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
21/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1929. Dep: 21/12/1929. | ||
08/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1930. Dep: 29/01/1931. | ||
16/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1931. Dep: 07/10/1931. | ||
24/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1932. Dep: 18/04/1932. Work undertaken: Steam Brakes fitted |
||
02/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1932. Dep: 08/09/1932. | ||
27/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. | ||
10/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1935. Dep: 14/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3617 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3624 (Diagram 18) |
||
09/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 09/08/1937. Dep: 09/08/1937. | ||
23/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/06/1938. Dep: 23/06/1938. | ||
13/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 12/04/1939. | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
05/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/05/1939. Dep: 09/05/1939. | ||
30/10/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1939. Dep: 01/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3626 (Diagram 18) |
||
01/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1942. Dep: 10/07/1942. | ||
07/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. | ||
10/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1944. Dep: 06/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 152 (Diagram 18) |
||
28/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/11/1945. Dep: 28/11/1945. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9842 | ||
16/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 18) |
||
11/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/09/1947. Dep: 06/10/1947. | ||
05/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/11/1947. Dep: 05/11/1947. | ||
19/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1948. Dep: 23/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22363 (Diagram 18) Renumbered to BR 69842 |
||
02/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (SALT) | ||
08/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Salisbury (SAL) | ||
13/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949. | ||
27/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1949. Dep: 18/05/1949. | ||
15/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. | ||
05/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950. | ||
22/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/06/1950. Dep: 22/06/1950. | ||
24/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950. | ||
20/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/12/1950. Dep: 27/01/1951. | ||
25/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
03/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 03/04/1951. | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
13/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
01/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
21/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1951. Dep: 26/11/1951. | ||
04/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22353 (Diagram 18) |
||
30/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1952. Dep: 17/07/1952. | ||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 01/09/1952. | ||
19/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (51E) | ||
18/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954. Work undertaken: Into store at Saltburn shed, 10/11/57 Boiler number 22040 (Diagram 18) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
10/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltburn (51K) | ||
02/02/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (51D) | ||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
29/10/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69842 from Thornaby (51L) | ||
08/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |