|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1919 | 04/1919 | General | Boiler number G665 (Diagram 61) |
|||
Darlington Works | 13/03/1923 | 30/05/1923 | 79 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1924 | 28/02/1925 | 87 days | General | Boiler number D1625 (Diagram 61) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1927 | 09/01/1928 | 97 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1929 | 28/03/1929 | 44 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1929 | 29/04/1929 | 25 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1930 | 27/03/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/04/1932 | 03/06/1932 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1932 | 16/09/1932 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1935 | 16/03/1935 | 39 days | General | Boiler number D1787 (Diagram 61) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1939 | 05/01/1940 | 40 days | General | Boiler number D1625 (Diagram 61) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/03/1943 | 27/05/1943 | 62 days | General | Superheated boiler. G S buffers & T Strap fitted Boiler number 2823 (Diagram 63C) Superheated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/08/1943 | 18/09/1943 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1944 | 06/12/1944 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 120 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1947 | 24/09/1947 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1949 | 18/04/1950 | 210 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 3359 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted Renumbered to BR 69791 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/08/1951 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1907 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 687 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 85 Allocated to Saltburn (SALT) Diagram 61 boiler fitted |
||
01/1917 | Modification | Modification: Rebuilt from 4-6-0T to 4-6-2T with increased coal and water capacity | ||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/04/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number G665 (Diagram 61) |
||
13/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1923. Dep: 30/05/1923. | ||
04/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1924. Dep: 28/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1625 (Diagram 61) |
||
05/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1927. Dep: 09/01/1928. | ||
13/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/02/1929. Dep: 28/03/1929. | ||
05/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1929. Dep: 29/04/1929. | ||
10/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1930. Dep: 27/03/1930. | ||
25/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1932. Dep: 03/06/1932. | ||
06/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/09/1932. Dep: 16/09/1932. | ||
12/10/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Middlesbrough (MID) | ||
06/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1787 (Diagram 61) |
||
27/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1939. Dep: 05/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1625 (Diagram 61) |
||
04/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK) | ||
28/02/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
27/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1943. Dep: 27/05/1943. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler. G S buffers & T Strap fitted Boiler number 2823 (Diagram 63C) Superheated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
||
21/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northallerton (NLN) | ||
23/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1943. Dep: 18/09/1943. | ||
01/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1944. Dep: 06/12/1944. | ||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
05/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9791 | ||
10/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. | ||
17/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/09/1947. Dep: 24/09/1947. | ||
21/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/09/1949. Dep: 18/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3359 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted Renumbered to BR 69791 |
||
11/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
08/1951 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/08/1951. | ||
16/08/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69791 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |