|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 10/1917 | General | Boiler number D489 (Diagram 61) |
||||
Darlington Works | 04/01/1923 | 06/04/1923 | 93 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/12/1925 | 26/03/1926 | 100 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1928 | 29/06/1928 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1929 | 11/04/1929 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/02/1932 | 22/03/1932 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1932 | 03/08/1932 | 70 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/06/1937 | 12/08/1937 | 72 days | General | Superheated boiler and G S Buffers fitted Boiler number 2824 (Diagram 63C) Superheated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1938 | 18/01/1939 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1941 | 30/05/1941 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 3064 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1943 | 13/10/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1944 | 01/08/1944 | 55 days | General | T strap fitted Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 63B) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1944 | 16/10/1944 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 20/10/1944 | 09/11/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1947 | 12/07/1947 | 45 days | General | Downs sanding fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 28/01/1949 | 12/02/1949 | 16 days | Light Casual | After collision Renumbered to BR 69793 |
||
Gateshead Works | 28/07/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gateshead Works | 20/11/1949 | 23/11/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1950 | 10/05/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 689 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 87 Allocated to Whitby (WBY) Diagram 61 boiler fitted |
||
05/1915 | Modification | Modification: Rebuilt from 4-6-0T to 4-6-2T with increased coal and water capacity | ||
10/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Dep: ?/10/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number D489 (Diagram 61) |
||
04/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1923. Dep: 06/04/1923. | ||
17/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1925. Dep: 26/03/1926. | ||
02/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
11/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1928. Dep: 29/06/1928. | ||
06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
19/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/03/1929. Dep: 11/04/1929. | ||
01/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1932. Dep: 22/03/1932. | ||
26/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1932. Dep: 03/08/1932. | ||
22/08/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Scarborough (SCA) | ||
02/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1937. Dep: 12/08/1937. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler and G S Buffers fitted Boiler number 2824 (Diagram 63C) Superheated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
||
19/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/12/1938. Dep: 18/01/1939. | ||
21/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1941. Dep: 30/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3064 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
||
29/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/09/1943. Dep: 13/10/1943. | ||
08/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1944. Dep: 01/08/1944. Work undertaken: T strap fitted Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 63B) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
20/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1944. Dep: 16/10/1944. | ||
20/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1944. Dep: 09/11/1944. | ||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9793 | ||
29/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1947. Dep: 12/07/1947. Work undertaken: Downs sanding fitted |
||
28/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/01/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR 69793 |
||
28/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. | ||
20/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1949. Dep: 23/11/1949. | ||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 10/05/1950. | ||
11/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
04/1951 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
09/04/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69793 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) |