|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1918 | 10/1918 | General | Boiler number G676 (Diagram 61) |
|||
Darlington Works | 1921 | 12/1921 | General | Boiler number D1343 (Diagram 61) |
|||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1924 | 31/05/1924 | 74 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 1926 | 30/11/1926 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1927 | 25/02/1927 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1929 | 11/02/1929 | 29 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/07/1929 | 10/09/1929 | 71 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1932 | 03/03/1932 | 49 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1933 | 24/11/1933 | 80 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1935 | 29/11/1935 | 51 days | General | Boiler number D1360 (Diagram 61) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1939 | 27/07/1939 | 149 days | General | Superheated boiler and G S buffers fitted Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1943 | 11/08/1943 | 5 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 12/05/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 37 days | General | T strap fitted Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 63B) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1946 | 26/10/1946 | 38 days | General | Downs sanding fitted Boiler number 2824 (Diagram 63C) Superheated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/03/1949 | 25/03/1949 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 69796 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1950 | 22/06/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3064 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 05/07/1950 | 13/07/1950 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1953 | Last class A6 condemned | Class 'A6' No. 69796 was received for scrap 31/3/53: this is the last of the 'Whitby Willies,' built originally for the Scarborough-Saltburn road; they have had a varied career, finishing up as goods pilots in the Hull and Starbeck districts | SLS/195306 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1908 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 692 Built at Gateshead Works, Works Number 90 Allocated to Whitby (WBY) Diagram 61 boiler fitted |
||
05/1916 | Modification | Modification: Rebuilt from 4-6-0T to 4-6-2T with increased coal and water capacity | ||
1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1918. Dep: ?/10/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number G676 (Diagram 61) |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/12/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1343 (Diagram 61) |
||
01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (MAL) | ||
19/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1924. Dep: 31/05/1924. | ||
09/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1926. Dep: 30/11/1926. | ||
21/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1927. Dep: 25/02/1927. | ||
14/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1929. Dep: 11/02/1929. | ||
02/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1929. Dep: 10/09/1929. | ||
15/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1932. Dep: 03/03/1932. | ||
06/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/09/1933. Dep: 24/11/1933. | ||
10/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1935. Dep: 29/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1360 (Diagram 61) |
||
24/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
02/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Whitby (WBY) | ||
01/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1939. Dep: 27/07/1939. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler and G S buffers fitted Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
||
21/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (MAL) | ||
05/03/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
31/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Malton (MAL) | ||
07/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 11/08/1943. | ||
12/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: T strap fitted Boiler number 3046 (Diagram 63B) Steam Brakes fitted |
||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9796 | ||
19/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946. Work undertaken: Downs sanding fitted Boiler number 2824 (Diagram 63C) Superheated LNER Diagram 63C Boiler Fitted |
||
13/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (HLB) | ||
04/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1949. Dep: 25/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69796 |
||
15/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1950. Dep: 22/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3064 (Diagram 63B) Superheated LNER Diagram 63B Boiler Fitted |
||
05/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1950. Dep: 13/07/1950. | ||
30/03/1953 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69796 from Hull Botanic Gardens (53B) | ||
04/1953 | Scrapped | Scrapped |