|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1920 | 11/02/1920 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1923 | 21/09/1923 | 68 days | General | Boiler number G946 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1928 | 17/07/1928 | 63 days | General | Boiler number G938 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/03/1930 | 03/10/1930 | 193 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1933 | 08/09/1933 | 31 days | General | Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/02/1936 | 21/04/1936 | 53 days | General | Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/10/1938 | 21/11/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/07/1941 | 01/09/1941 | 50 days | General | Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/09/1944 | 02/11/1944 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1946 | 28/12/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1947 | 17/01/1947 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1949 | 12/03/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69773 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1950 | 05/01/1951 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1951 | 16/07/1951 | 32 days | General | Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 24709 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1910 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1129 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1920. Dep: 11/02/1920. | ||
16/07/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1923. Dep: 21/09/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number G946 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
19/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
23/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
30/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
01/09/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
21/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1928. Dep: 17/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number G938 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
25/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1930. Dep: 03/10/1930. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
09/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1933. Dep: 08/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
29/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1936. Dep: 21/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
17/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1938. Dep: 21/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2381 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
03/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
06/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shoeburyness (13D) | ||
11/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1941. Dep: 01/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2055 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
23/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
11/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. | ||
29/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1944. Dep: 02/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
12/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9773 | ||
23/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1946. Dep: 28/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2378 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 17/01/1947. | ||
16/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1949. Dep: 12/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69773 |
||
04/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1950. Dep: 05/01/1951. | ||
15/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1951. Dep: 16/07/1951. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to Part 1 Boiler number 24709 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
23/03/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69773 from Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
09/1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped |