|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1919 | 05/1919 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D623 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 23/03/1923 | 16/06/1923 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1926 | 25/02/1927 | 115 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1929 | 10/09/1929 | 64 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1932 | 07/07/1932 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/10/1936 | 22/12/1936 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1940 | 22/06/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/08/1944 | 02/09/1944 | 25 days | General | Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1946 | 18/10/1946 | 42 days | General | Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/11/1946 | 08/11/1946 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/11/1946 | 27/11/1946 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/09/1948 | 01/10/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69777 |
||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1950 | 14/10/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24361 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1950 | 17/10/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1952 | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1175 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/05/1919. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number D623 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
23/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1923. Dep: 16/06/1923. | ||
03/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1926. Dep: 25/02/1927. | ||
09/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1929. Dep: 10/09/1929. | ||
01/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1932. Dep: 07/07/1932. | ||
13/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1936. Dep: 22/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
29/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1940. Dep: 22/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
14/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2200 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
09/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9777 | ||
07/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1946. Dep: 18/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2049 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
05/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/11/1946. Dep: 08/11/1946. | ||
20/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1946. Dep: 27/11/1946. | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69777 |
||
18/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24361 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
16/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1950. Dep: 17/10/1950. | ||
04/1952 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/05/1952. | ||
12/05/1952 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69777 from Hull Springhead (53C) |