|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1921 | 03/1921 | General | ||||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1923 | 14/07/1923 | 80 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/01/1925 | 08/05/1925 | 108 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/01/1926 | 16/02/1926 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1927 | 14/09/1927 | 115 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1929 | 15/11/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1931 | 18/12/1931 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/07/1934 | 10/09/1934 | 57 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/09/1934 | 18/09/1934 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/06/1935 | 15/08/1935 | 59 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 20/07/1938 | 09/09/1938 | 52 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1941 | 24/06/1941 | 76 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/09/1941 | 25/09/1941 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1944 | 10/03/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1947 | 16/01/1948 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1949 | 06/01/1950 | 58 days | General | Renumbered to BR 69778 |
||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1952 | 16/02/1952 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1952 | 21/02/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Darlington Works | On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1176 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Thirsk (TSK) |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/03/1921. | ||
26/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1923. Dep: 14/07/1923. | ||
21/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1925. Dep: 08/05/1925. | ||
26/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1926. Dep: 16/02/1926. | ||
23/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1927. Dep: 14/09/1927. | ||
12/12/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
20/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1929. Dep: 15/11/1929. | ||
25/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
02/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1931. Dep: 18/12/1931. | ||
16/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1934. Dep: 10/09/1934. | ||
11/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1934. Dep: 18/09/1934. | ||
18/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1935. Dep: 15/08/1935. | ||
20/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1938. Dep: 09/09/1938. | ||
27/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT) | ||
24/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
10/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1941. Dep: 24/06/1941. | ||
02/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1941. Dep: 25/09/1941. | ||
10/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1944. Dep: 10/03/1944. | ||
05/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. | ||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9778 | ||
28/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1947. Dep: 16/01/1948. | ||
10/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1949. Dep: 06/01/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 69778 |
||
16/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1952. Dep: 16/02/1952. | ||
18/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/02/1952. Dep: 21/02/1952. | ||
03/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
03/05/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69778 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
06/1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped |